EP3753834 - BICYCLE HYDRAULIC PRESSURE CONTROL UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ATSUSHI, Hiroaki c/o Bosch Corporation 9/1, Ushikubo 3-chome, Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 224-8501 / JP | 02 /
CHIBA, Kazuki c/o Bosch Corporation 9/1, Ushikubo 3-chome, Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 224-8501 / JP | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2023/31] |
Former [2020/52] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19713844.9 | 01.02.2019 | [2020/52] | WO2019IB50805 | Priority number, date | JP20180023637 | 14.02.2018 Original published format: JP 2018023637 | [2020/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019159029 | Date: | 22.08.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3753834 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3753834 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B62L3/02, B62K25/08, B60T8/36 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
B62L3/023 (EP,US);
B60T8/176 (US);
B60T8/1706 (US);
B60T8/3225 (US);
B60T8/3685 (EP);
B60T2270/10 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYDRAULISCHER DRUCKMODULATOR FÜR FAHRRAD | [2023/10] | English: | BICYCLE HYDRAULIC PRESSURE CONTROL UNIT | [2020/52] | French: | MODULATEUR DE PRESSION HYDRAULIQUE POUR BICYCLETTE | [2023/10] |
Former [2020/52] | HYDRAULISCHE DRUCKSTEUEREINHEIT FÜR EIN FAHRRAD | ||
Former [2020/52] | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE PRESSION HYDRAULIQUE DE BICYCLETTE | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2020 | Translation filed | 14.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/52] | 14.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 02.08.2023 | DK | 02.08.2023 | EE | 02.08.2023 | ES | 02.08.2023 | FI | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | IT | 02.08.2023 | LT | 02.08.2023 | LV | 02.08.2023 | MC | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SE | 02.08.2023 | SI | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | PT | 04.12.2023 | [2024/45] |
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 02.08.2023 | |
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
IT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SI | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 02.08.2023 | |
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
IT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 02.08.2023 | |
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 02.08.2023 | |
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 02.08.2023 | |
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 02.08.2023 | |
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 02.08.2023 | |
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 02.08.2023 | |
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE20204408U (BACKE WOLFGANG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE102005004465 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]DE102008019469 (WREDE JUERGEN [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]DE102013217254 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [Y] 1-3,10,12-14 * abstract *; | [A]JP2015074345 (ADVICS CO LTD) [A] 1,2* abstract *; | [A]US2015329094 (WEH ANDREAS [DE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [YD]WO2017115171 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [YD] 1-3,10,12-14 * abstract * |