EP3765175 - REINFORCED GAS-PERMEABLE MEMBRANE AND REINFORCED GAS-PERMEABLE WELL UTILIZING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.09.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Broadley-James Corporation 19 Thomas Irvine, CA 92618 / US | [2021/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FENG, Chang-Dong c/o Broadley-James Corporation 19 Thomas Irvine, California 92618 / US | 02 /
ROTHMAN, Josh L. c/o Broadley-James Corporation 19 Thomas Irvine, California 92618 / US | 03 /
GARRAHY, Robert J. c/o Broadley-James Corporation 19 Thomas Irvine, California 92618 / US | 04 /
BROADLEY, Scott T. c/o Broadley-James Corporation 19 Thomas Irvine, California 92618 / US | [2021/03] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/03] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 19713964.5 | 13.03.2019 | [2021/03] | WO2019US22101 | Priority number, date | US201862643605P | 15.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862643605 P | [2021/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019178265 | Date: | 19.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3765175 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B01D65/00, B01L3/00, B01D69/10, B29C70/04, C12M1/34, G01N31/22, A61M39/18, B01D69/02, C12M1/00, G01N27/28, G01D11/24, G01N33/497 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
B01D65/003 (EP,US);
C12M23/24 (EP,US);
A61M39/18 (US);
B01D69/02 (EP,US);
B01D69/1071 (EP,US);
C12M23/12 (US);
C12M23/14 (EP,US);
C12M23/28 (EP,US);
C12M23/42 (US);
C12M41/00 (US);
C12M41/34 (EP,US);
G01N33/4977 (EP,US);
B01D2313/025 (EP,US);
B01D2313/041 (EP,US);
B01D2313/042 (EP,US);
B01D2313/205 (EP);
B01D2313/60 (EP);
B01D2323/58 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] | Title | German: | VERSTÄRKTE GASDURCHLÄSSIGE MEMBRAN UND DIESE VERWENDENDE VERSTÄRKTE GASDURCHLÄSSIGE VERTIEFUNG | [2021/03] | English: | REINFORCED GAS-PERMEABLE MEMBRANE AND REINFORCED GAS-PERMEABLE WELL UTILIZING SAME | [2021/03] | French: | MEMBRANE RENFORCÉE PERMÉABLE AUX GAZ ET PUITS RENFORCÉ PERMÉABLE AUX GAZ L'UTILISANT | [2021/03] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 08.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2012023888 (ADIXEN SCANDINAVIA AB [SE], et al); | [I]US2012097557 (BAUMFALK REINHARD [DE], et al); | [IY]US2012171760 (RAO GOVIND [US], et al); | [A]US2016250632 (HONG YULONG [US], et al); | [Y]US2018055985 (STOECKER MARTIN [DE]) |