EP3768248 - A SOLID PHARMACEUTICAL TABLET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fertin Pharma A/S Dandyvej 19 7100 Vejle / DK | [2021/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEERGAARD, Jesper Bag Hjelm 15 6200 Aabenraa / DK | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | Patentgruppen A/S Aaboulevarden 31, 4th Floor 8000 Aarhus C / DK | [2021/04] | Application number, filing date | 19714544.4 | 21.03.2019 | [2021/04] | WO2019DK50100 | Priority number, date | US201815933942 | 23.03.2018 Original published format: US201815933942 | [2021/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019179589 | Date: | 26.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3768248 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3768248 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/68, A61K9/20, A61K31/167, A61K31/192, A61K33/06 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
A61K9/0058 (EP,US);
A61K33/10 (EP,US);
A61K31/167 (EP,US);
A61K31/192 (EP,US);
A61K9/0053 (US);
A61K9/20 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FESTE PHARMAZEUTISCHE TABLETTE | [2021/04] | English: | A SOLID PHARMACEUTICAL TABLET | [2021/04] | French: | COMPRIMÉ PHARMACEUTIQUE SOLIDE | [2021/04] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 07.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20216277.2 / EP3831368 | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 14.06.2023 | RO | 14.06.2023 | RS | 14.06.2023 | SK | 14.06.2023 | SM | 14.06.2023 | GR | 15.09.2023 | IS | 14.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/08] | HR | 14.06.2023 | |
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 14.06.2023 | |
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | GR | 15.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03059082 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US], et al) [X] 1-37 * page 11, line 10 - page 12, line 20 * * example - *; | [X]US2010215799 (COSGROVE TERENCE [GB], et al) [X] 1-37 * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0026] * * example 4 *; | [X]WO2015070875 (FERTIN PHARMA AS [DK]) [X] 1-37 * page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 3 * * page 19, line 15 - page 21, line 20 * * examples 2-4 *; | [X]WO2017059858 (FERTIN PHARMA AS [DK]) [X] 31* example 4 * | by applicant | WO2002DK00461 | WO2002DK00462 |