EP3743681 - SURVEYING INSTRUMENT FOR AND SURVEYING METHOD OF SURVEYING REFERENCE POINTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.06.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.07.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | 19.09.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FNV IP B.V. Veurse Achterweg 10 2264 SG Leidschendam / NL | [2024/43] |
Former [2020/49] | For all designated states FNV IP B.V. Veurse Achterweg 10 2264 SG Leidschendam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN WEEREN, Dennis Fedoralaan 31 2152 DE Niew Vennep / NL | 02 /
JONGSMA, Arnoud Marc Kromme Spieringweg 298 2141 BV Vijfhuizen / NL | 03 /
SEIBERT, Joachim Ulrich Liseiland 4 2285 JT Rijswijk / NL | 04 /
DE BIJL, Mario Josephus Hoefkade 552 2526 CM Den Haag / NL | [2020/49] | Representative(s) | FNV Intellectual Property Veurse Achterweg 10 2264 SG Leidschendam / NL | [2024/43] |
Former [2020/49] | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 19714840.6 | 22.01.2019 | [2020/49] | WO2019NL50037 | Priority number, date | NL20182020304 | 22.01.2018 Original published format: NL 2020304 | NL20182021199 | 28.06.2018 Original published format: NL 2021199 | [2020/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019143250 | Date: | 25.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3743681 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3743681 | Date: | 23.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/00, G01B11/16, G01C11/06, G01C15/04, G01S1/70, G01S5/16, G01C3/14 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
G01B11/002 (EP,US);
G01B11/16 (EP);
G01B11/161 (US);
G01C11/06 (EP,US);
G01C15/04 (EP);
G01S5/16 (EP);
G06T7/248 (US);
H04N23/51 (US);
H04N23/56 (US);
G01C3/14 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/49] | G01B11/00, G01B11/16, G01C11/06, G01C15/04, G01S1/70, G01S5/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERMESSUNGSINSTRUMENT UND VERMESSUNGSVERFAHREN ZUM VERMESSEN VON REFERENZPUNKTEN | [2020/49] | English: | SURVEYING INSTRUMENT FOR AND SURVEYING METHOD OF SURVEYING REFERENCE POINTS | [2020/49] | French: | INSTRUMENT D'ARPENTAGE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ARPENTAGE PERMETTANT D'ARPENTER DES POINTS DE RÉFÉRENCE | [2020/49] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/49] | 22.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24200822.5 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6324296 (MCSHEERY TRACY D [US], et al); | [X]EP1580523 (TECHNODREAM21 INC [JP]); | [X]EP2910967 (ADYS CONTROLS INC [US]); | [A]US2017328982 (JONGSMA ARNOUD MARC [NL], et al); | by applicant | DE29517080U | US6408136 | JP2004325072 | JP2004325073 | US7003177 | WO2006125975 | US2008011937 | WO2008094141 | US2008204699 | EP1983397 | WO2008148053 | CN101368821 | CN101614530 | US2014354886 | WO2016068715 | CN107300827 |