EP3759549 - OPTICAL PARAMETRIC OSCILLATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.09.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blue Industry and Science 208 bis rue La Fayette 75010 Paris / FR | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEORGES DES AULNOIS, Johann 5 rue du Général Leclerc 78000 Versailles / FR | 02 /
SZYMANSKI, Benjamin 14 rue Garibaldi 93310 Le Pré-Saint-Gervais / FR | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 19715152.5 | 27.02.2019 | [2021/01] | WO2019FR50448 | Priority number, date | FR20180051802 | 01.03.2018 Original published format: FR 1851802 | [2021/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019166740 | Date: | 06.09.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3759549 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3759549 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/35 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
G02F1/39 (EP,US);
G02F1/3501 (US);
G02F1/3551 (US);
G02F1/3509 (US);
G02F1/3548 (EP);
G02F2202/20 (US);
G02F2203/15 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHER PARAMETRISCHER OSZILLATOR | [2021/01] | English: | OPTICAL PARAMETRIC OSCILLATOR | [2021/01] | French: | OSCILLATEUR PARAMETRIQUE OPTIQUE | [2021/01] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 04.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.06.2023 | CZ | 07.06.2023 | DK | 07.06.2023 | EE | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | FI | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | IT | 07.06.2023 | LT | 07.06.2023 | LV | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | NL | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SE | 07.06.2023 | SI | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | PT | 09.10.2023 | [2024/45] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
IT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SI | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SI | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9810497 (LAURELL FREDRIK [SE]) [Y] 1-4,6,7,9 * abstract * * page 17, line 26 - page 18, line 5 *; | [Y]US2009257462 (FURUKAWA AKIO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4,6,7,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] , [0044] - [0049] *; | [AD]US8542435 (RAYBAUT MYRIAM [FR], et al) [AD] 1-9* the whole document *; | [Y]WO2013186555 (ITI SCOTLAND SCOTTISH ENTPR [GB]) [Y] 1-4,6,7,9 * abstract * * page 1, line 34 - page 2, line 21 * * page 6, lines 25-31 *; | [Y] - P. E. POWERS ET AL, "Continuous tuning of a continuous-wave periodically poled lithium niobate optical parametric oscillator by use of a fan-out grating design", OPTICS LETTERS, US, (19980201), vol. 23, no. 3, doi:10.1364/OL.23.000159, ISSN 0146-9592, page 159, XP055320431 [Y] 1-4,6,7,9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.23.000159 | by applicant | EP2503387 |