EP3776068 - ADJUSTMENT OF SUBJECTIVE AND OBJECTIVE REFRACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rodenstock GmbH Elsenheimerstrasse 33 80687 München / DE | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUSCHIELOK, Adam Forstenrieder Allee 49 81476 München / DE | 02 /
ALTHEIMER, Helmut An der Halde 2 87650 Baisweil-Lauchdorf / DE | 03 /
BECKEN, Wolfgang Ettaler Straße 23 82061 Neuried / DE | 04 /
ESSER, Gregor Säulingstraße 22 80686 München / DE | 05 /
UTTENWEILER, Dietmar Walchstadter Str. 25 82057 Icking / DE | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19715434.7 | 28.03.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019EP57820 | Priority number, date | DE20181002630 | 29.03.2018 Original published format: DE102018002630 | [2021/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019185770 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3776068 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3776068 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G02C7/02 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
G02C7/027 (EP,IL,US);
A61B3/0025 (IL,US);
A61B3/028 (IL,US);
A61B3/103 (IL,US);
G06N7/00 (IL,US);
G16H50/20 (IL);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANGLEICH DER SUBJEKTIVEN UND OBJEKTIVEN REFRAKTIONEN | [2021/07] | English: | ADJUSTMENT OF SUBJECTIVE AND OBJECTIVE REFRACTIONS | [2021/07] | French: | AJUSTEMENT DES RÉFRACTIONS SUBJECTIVE ET OBJECTIVE | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 08.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 17.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP21185761.0 / EP3926390 | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 27.09.2023 | PL | 27.09.2023 | RO | 27.09.2023 | RS | 27.09.2023 | SK | 27.09.2023 | SM | 27.09.2023 | NO | 27.12.2023 | GR | 28.12.2023 | IS | 27.01.2024 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 27.09.2023 | |
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | RS | 27.09.2023 | |
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/12] | RS | 27.09.2023 | |
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 27.12.2023 | |
GR | 28.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2011255053 (DREHER ANDREAS W [US], et al); | [XYI]US2012069297 (CABEZA JESUS MIGUEL GUILLEN [DE], et al); | [XI]US2013100410 (LIANG JUNZHONG [US]); | [Y]US2014218681 (SPRATT RAY STEVEN [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2009007136 |