EP3773777 - WOUND THERAPY SYSTEM WITH WOUND VOLUME ESTIMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LT, NO | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solventum Intellectual Properties Company 3M Center, 275-6E-21 2510 Conway Ave E Maplewood, MN 55144 / US | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/03] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2021/07] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOORE, Brett, L. 6635 Biscay Bay San Antonio, TX 78249 / US | 02 /
INGRAM, Shannon, C. 30155 Bridlegate Drive Bulverde, TX 78163 / US | 03 /
RICE, Justin, R. 507 Ogden Ln San Antonio, TX 78209 / US | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Simmons & Simmons City Point One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9SS / GB | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19716660.6 | 25.03.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019US23904 | Priority number, date | US201862650132P | 29.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862650132 P | US201962799241P | 31.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962799241 P | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019190993 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3773777 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3773777 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/00, A61M3/02, A61B5/107 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
A61B5/1073 (EP,US);
A61B5/1076 (EP,US);
A61B5/445 (US);
A61F13/05 (US);
A61M1/71 (US);
A61M1/73 (EP,US);
A61M1/77 (EP,US);
A61M1/85 (EP,US);
A61M1/92 (EP,US);
A61M1/96 (EP,US);
A61M1/962 (US);
A61M1/964 (US);
A61M3/022 (EP,US);
A61M3/0258 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00174 (US);
A61F2013/8494 (US);
A61M1/732 (EP,US);
A61M1/742 (EP,US);
A61M2205/15 (US);
A61M2205/3331 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3334 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3337 (US);
A61M2205/3344 (US);
A61M2205/3379 (US);
A61M2205/702 (US);
A61M3/0202 (EP,US);
A61M35/006 (US);
A61M35/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WUNDTHERAPIESYSTEM MIT WUNDVOLUMENSCHÄTZUNG | [2021/07] | English: | WOUND THERAPY SYSTEM WITH WOUND VOLUME ESTIMATION | [2021/07] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DE PLAIE PERMETTANT UNE ESTIMATION DU VOLUME DE LA PLAIE | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 21.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24151949.5 / EP4331481 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LT | 17.01.2024 | NL | 17.01.2024 | NO | 17.04.2024 | IS | 17.05.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/32] | NL | 17.01.2024 | |
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 17.01.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XAY]US2015032031 (HARTWELL EDWARD [GB]) [X] 1-6,8,16,18-23 * paragraphs 0004-0007, 0038, 0040, 0069-0072; figures 10-12 * [A] 7,9-15 [Y] 17,24-27; | [Y]EP3269404 (CG BIO CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 17,24-27* paragraphs 0040, 0092, 0107, 0112, 0138; figures 1, 7 * | by applicant | US7651484 | US8394081 | US19790625775 |