EP3782065 - METHOD FOR SECURING A COMPUTER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thales Dis France SAS 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2022/04] |
Former [2021/08] | For all designated states Thales DIS France SA 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELHOSTE, Fabrice c/o GEMALTO SA Intellectual Property Department 525, Avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS12023 13881 GEMENOS CEDEX / FR | 02 /
PAILLARD, Frédéric c/o GEMALTO SA Intellectual Property Department 525, Avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS12023 13881 GEMENOS CEDEX / FR | 03 /
DANDELOT, Thomas c/o GEMALTO SA Intellectual Property Department 525, Avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS12023 13881 GEMENOS CEDEX / FR | 04 /
DUQUESNOY, Jean-Philippe c/o GEMALTO SA Intellectual Property Department 525, Avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS12023 13881 GEMENOS CEDEX / FR | 05 /
DRU, Camille c/o GEMALTO SA Intellectual Property Department 525, Avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS12023 13881 GEMENOS CEDEX / FR | 06 /
ROUBINET, Gregory c/o GEMALTO SA Intellectual Property Department 525, Avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS12023 13881 GEMENOS CEDEX / FR | [2021/08] | Representative(s) | Grevin, Emmanuel Thales Dis France SAS Intellectual Property Department 525, avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS12023 13881 Gémenos Cedex / FR | [2024/39] |
Former [2021/08] | Grevin, Emmanuel Thales Dis France SA Intellectual Property Department 525, avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS12023 13881 Gémenos Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 19716931.1 | 16.04.2019 | [2021/08] | WO2019EP59772 | Priority number, date | EP20180305485 | 19.04.2018 Original published format: EP 18305485 | EP20180306129 | 22.08.2018 Original published format: EP 18306129 | [2021/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019201900 | Date: | 24.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3782065 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3782065 | Date: | 25.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/54, G06F21/55, G06F21/57 | [2021/08] | CPC: |
G06F21/54 (EP);
G06Q20/363 (US);
G06F21/554 (EP,US);
G06F21/577 (EP,US);
G06Q20/382 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SICHERUNG EINES COMPUTERSYSTEMS | [2021/08] | English: | METHOD FOR SECURING A COMPUTER SYSTEM | [2021/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR SÉCURISER UN SYSTÈME INFORMATIQUE | [2024/16] |
Former [2021/08] | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE SÉCURISER UN SYSTÈME INFORMATIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 19.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2017024561 (HAJMASAN GHEORGHE F [RO], et al); | [IP]US9960975 (VAN HORENBEECK MAARTEN [US], et al); |