EP3774083 - FLUID IMPERMEABLE ULTRASONIC TRANSDUCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Labcyte Inc. 170 Rose Orchard Way San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/07] | For all designated states Labcyte Inc. 170 Rose Orchard Way San Jose CA 95134 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HADIMIOGLU, Babur c/o Labcyte Inc. 170 Rose Orchard Way San Jose, CA 95134 / US | 02 /
DAULTON, Jay c/o Labcyte Inc. 170 Rose Orchard Way San Jose, CA 95134 / US | 03 /
ELLSON, Richard N. c/o Labcyte Inc. 170 Rose Orchard Way San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/07] | 01 /
HADIMIOGLU, Babur c/o Labcyte Inc. 170 Rose Orchard Way San Jose, California 95134 / US | ||
02 /
DAULTON, Jay c/o Labcyte Inc. 170 Rose Orchard Way San Jose, California 95134 / US | |||
03 /
ELLSON, Richard N. c/o Labcyte Inc. 170 Rose Orchard Way San Jose, California 95134 / US | Representative(s) | Lewis Silkin LLP Arbor 255 Blackfriars Road London SE1 9AX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/07] | Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 19717093.9 | 29.03.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019US24837 | Priority number, date | US201862650919P | 30.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862650919 P | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019191587 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3774083 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B06B1/06, G10K11/30, G10K11/02 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
B06B1/0685 (EP,KR,US);
B06B1/067 (EP,KR,US);
G01N29/32 (US);
G01N29/2437 (US);
G01N29/2456 (US);
G01N29/28 (US);
G10K11/02 (EP,KR,US);
G10K11/30 (EP,KR,US);
H04R23/00 (US);
H04R31/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSDICHTER ULTRASCHALLWANDLER | [2021/07] | English: | FLUID IMPERMEABLE ULTRASONIC TRANSDUCER | [2021/07] | French: | TRANSDUCTEUR ULTRASONORE IMPERMÉABLE AUX FLUIDES | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 30.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.09.2024 | 03.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US3989965 (SMITH RICHARD W, et al); | [XI]WO0104969 (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERV INC [US]); | [Y]US6492762 (PANT BHARAT B [US], et al); | [XYI]US2007055183 (KAMINSKI PERRY [US], et al); | [Y]US2011181149 (SHIKATA HIROYUKI [JP]) | by applicant | US4308547 | US5041849 | CA2127039 | US6416164 | US8544976 |