EP3776160 - DEVICE OPERATION CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2021 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jones, Maria Francisca 4 Layard Road Forty Hill Enfield, Middlesex EN1 4BB / GB | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2021/07] | Creation IP Ltd Hillington Park Innovation Centre 1 Ainslie Road Glasgow G52 4RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 19717551.6 | 29.03.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019GB50933 | Priority number, date | GB20180005269 | 29.03.2018 Original published format: GB 201805269 | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019186203 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3776160 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0487, G06F3/01 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
G06F3/0487 (EP,GB,KR);
G06F3/017 (EP,GB,KR);
G06F3/0484 (GB,KR);
G06F1/163 (GB,KR);
G06F3/011 (KR);
G06F3/0482 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | STEUERUNG EINES GERÄTEBETRIEBS | [2021/07] | English: | DEVICE OPERATION CONTROL | [2021/07] | French: | COMMANDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT DE DISPOSITIF | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 15.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/43] | 18.05.2021 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 09.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2021/43] | 09.06.2021 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002140666 (BRADSKI GARY R [US]) [A] 20* paragraph [0017] *; | [A]US2010216517 (JUNG WOO JIN [KR], et al) [A] 2,11 * paragraphs [0065] - [0069] *; | [I]US2012306903 (GRIFFIN JASON TYLER [CA]) [I] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2014184495 (QUIN JOSEPH PATRICK [US]) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0013] - [0021] * |