EP3774447 - VEHICLE, IN PARTICULAR MOBILE HOME OR RECREATIONAL VEHICLE OR SIMILAR, WITH A LIVING SPACE EXTENSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/07] | VEHICLE, IN PARTICULAR MOTORHOME OR THE LIKE, HAVING A LIVING SPACE EXTENSION | ||
[2021/49] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Erwin Hymer Group SE Holzstrasse 19 88339 Bad Waldsee / DE | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DORN, Günter Bauernjörgweg 16 88281 Schlier / DE | 02 /
BUCK, Rainer Keplerweg 28 88239 Wangen / DE | 03 /
METZLER, Marcus Heckengasse 2 88339 Bad Waldsee / DE | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB (Muc) Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/07] | Waller, Stefan Waller-IP Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Landshuter Allee 10 80637 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19717811.4 | 09.04.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019EP58974 | Priority number, date | DE201810108385 | 09.04.2018 Original published format: DE102018108385 | DE201810111743 | 16.05.2018 Original published format: DE102018111743 | [2021/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019197412 | Date: | 17.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3774447 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60P3/34 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
B60P3/34 (EP,US);
B60P3/341 (US);
B62D29/043 (US);
E04H15/008 (EP);
E04H15/06 (EP);
E04H2015/205 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUG, INSBESONDERE WOHNMOBIL ODER REISEMOBIL ODER DERGLEICHEN, MIT EINER WOHNRAUMVERGRÖSSERUNG | [2021/07] | English: | VEHICLE, IN PARTICULAR MOBILE HOME OR RECREATIONAL VEHICLE OR SIMILAR, WITH A LIVING SPACE EXTENSION | [2021/49] | French: | VÉHICULE, EN PARTICULIER AUTOCARAVANE OU CAMPING-CAR OU SIMILAIRE, PRÉSENTANT UNE EXTENSION DE L'ESPACE D'HABITATION | [2021/07] |
Former [2021/07] | VEHICLE, IN PARTICULAR MOTORHOME OR THE LIKE, HAVING A LIVING SPACE EXTENSION | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 09.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]US6735909 (GARDNER STEWART [US]); | [A]EP2093103 (CATTABRIGA SIMONA [IT]); | [A]AU2008258189B (D L HANSEN SERVICE PTY LTD [AU]); | [A]US2016347230 (PELLICER FERNANDO [CA]); | [YA]US2018079348 (RONSEN DAVID [US]) |