EP3785286 - RELAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.05.2022 [2022/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG Flachsmarktstraße 8 32825 Blomberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/09] | For all designated states Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG Flachsmarktstrasse 8 32825 Blomberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFFMANN, Ralf Breitunger Weg 31A 12349 Berlin / DE | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | Patentship Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Paul-Gerhardt-Allee 50 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/09] | Patentship Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elsenheimerstraße 65 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19717826.2 | 10.04.2019 | [2021/09] | WO2019EP59088 | Priority number, date | DE201810109856 | 24.04.2018 Original published format: DE102018109856 | [2021/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019206635 | Date: | 31.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3785286 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01H50/04, H01H50/36 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
H01H50/041 (EP);
H01H50/043 (US);
H01H50/18 (US);
H01H50/36 (EP,US);
H01H2050/044 (EP,US);
H01H2050/046 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Title | German: | RELAIS | [2021/09] | English: | RELAY | [2021/09] | French: | RELAIS | [2021/09] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 05.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 14.04.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2221702 (PAUL & SIEDLER) [A] 1-17 * page 4, paragraph 7 - page 5, paragraph 2; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]DE102009047192 (TYCO ELECTRONICS AMP GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-17* page 6, paragraph 0041 - page 7, paragraph 0049; figures 11-16 * |