EP3746235 - TURBINE STATOR VANE COMPRISING AN INNER COOLING WALL PRODUCED BY ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Safran Helicopter Engines 64510 Bordes / FR | [2020/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALLOUIN, Baptiste c/o Cepi Safran Rond-Point René Ravaud -Réau 77550 Moissy-Cramayel / FR | 02 /
BREINING, Jean-Luc c/o Cepi Safran Rond-Point René Ravaud -Réau 77550 Moissy-Cramayel / FR | 03 /
LABERNY, Damien c/o Cepi Safran Rond-Point René Ravaud -Réau 77550 Moissy-Cramayel / FR | [2020/50] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2023/41] |
Former [2020/50] | Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 19718800.6 | 26.03.2019 | [2020/50] | WO2019FR50678 | Priority number, date | FR20180052764 | 29.03.2018 Original published format: FR 1852764 | [2020/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019186046 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3746235 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3746235 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B22C9/04, B22F3/105, F01D5/14, F01D5/18, F01D5/28 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
B22C9/04 (EP,US);
F01D5/147 (EP,US);
F01D5/187 (EP,US);
F01D5/28 (US);
F01D5/284 (EP);
B22F10/28 (EP,US);
B33Y10/00 (US);
B33Y80/00 (US);
F05D2230/20 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DURCH GENERATIVE FERTIGUNG HERGESTELLTE TURBINENLEITSCHAUFEL MIT INNENKÜHLUNGSWAND | [2020/50] | English: | TURBINE STATOR VANE COMPRISING AN INNER COOLING WALL PRODUCED BY ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING | [2020/50] | French: | AUBE DE DISTRIBUTEUR DE TURBINE COMPORTANT UNE PAROI INTERNE DE REFROIDISSEMENT ISSUE DE FABRICATION ADDITIVE | [2020/50] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/50] | 31.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.10.2023 | ES | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | LT | 11.10.2023 | LV | 11.10.2023 | NL | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SE | 11.10.2023 | BG | 11.01.2024 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | PT | 12.02.2024 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 11.10.2023 | |
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 11.10.2023 | |
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 11.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2015009448 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1,3,4,7-9 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * figures 6-12 * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0061] * [I] 2,5,6; | [A]EP3051066 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * figures 2,3 * * paragraphs [0036] - [0037] *; | [A]FR3037974 (SNECMA [FR]) [A] 1-9 * figures 3-6 *; | [A]FR3044038 (TURBOMECA [FR]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO2017137709 (SAFRAN [FR]) [A] 1-9 * abstract ** figure 3 * | by applicant | FR2893080 | FR3039199 |