EP3781124 - METHOD FOR STABILIZING PROTEIN COMPRISING FORMULATIONS BY USING A MEGLUMINE SALT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2021/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KORPUS, Christoph Esperantostrasse 21 60598 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02 /
GUEBELI, Raphael Johannes Brandisstrasse 9 64285 Darmstadt / DE | [2021/08] | Representative(s) | Merck Patent Association Merck Patent GmbH 64271 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 19719218.0 | 16.04.2019 | [2021/08] | WO2019EP59771 | Priority number, date | EP20180167607 | 16.04.2018 Original published format: EP 18167607 | [2021/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019201899 | Date: | 24.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3781124 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K39/395, A61K47/12, A61K47/18, A61K9/19, A61K47/26 | [2021/08] | CPC: |
A61K39/39591 (EP,KR);
C07K1/02 (US);
A61K47/183 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/26 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0021 (EP);
A61K9/08 (KR);
A61K9/19 (EP,KR);
C07K16/00 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STABILISIERUNG VON PROTEIN MIT FORMULIERUNGEN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES MEGLUMINSALZES | [2021/08] | English: | METHOD FOR STABILIZING PROTEIN COMPRISING FORMULATIONS BY USING A MEGLUMINE SALT | [2021/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE STABILISATION DE FORMULATIONS COMPRENANT DES PROTÉINES À L'AIDE D'UN SEL DE MÉGLUMINE | [2021/08] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 14.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Request for further processing for: | 09.08.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 09.08.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.08.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1908482 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-18,20-24 * claims 6, 7, 9, 10, 19-21 * * paragraph [0027] * [I] 19; | [XI]EP2526963 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-17,19,21,24 * claims 1, 9, 13 * * paragraph [0049] * [I] 18,20,22,23; | [XI]WO2016103034 (DRUG DISCOVERY LAB AS [NO]) [X] 1-18,20-24 * claims 48-55 * * examples 7, 8 * * page 58, lines 8-9 *[I] 19 | by applicant | US2013108643 | US8945543 | - WANG, W., Int J Pharm, (19990000), vol. 185, no. 2, pages 129 - 88 | - HAWE, A.; WIGGENHORN, M.; VAN DE WEERT, M.; GARBE, J. H.; MAHLER, H. C.; JISKOOT, W., "Forced degradation of therapeutic proteins", J Pharm Sci, (20120000), vol. 101, pages 895 - 913 | - ARAKAWA, T.; TIMASHEFF, S. N., "The stabilization of proteins by osmolytes", Biophysical Journal, (19850000), vol. 47, pages 411 - 14, XP009072024 | - MENZEN, T.; FRIESS, W., J Pharm Sci, (20130000), vol. 102, pages 415 - 28 | - J. Immunol. Methods., (20010201), vol. 248, no. 1-2, pages 7 - 15 | - IntJ Clin Pract., (20050100), vol. 59, no. 1, pages 114 - 8 | - J Immunol Methods, (20041200), vol. 295, no. 1-2, pages 49 - 56 | - Proc Natl AcadSci USA., (20030318), vol. 100, no. 6, pages 3191 - 6 | - Nat Biotechnol., (20040500), vol. 22, no. 5, pages 575 - 82 | - SHIRE, S. J. et al., "Challenges in the development of high protein concentration formulations", J. Pharm. Sc, (20040000), vol. 93, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1002/jps.20079, pages 1390 - 1402, XP009108986 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.20079 | - Pharm. Biotechnol, (20020000), vol. 13, pages 109 - 33 | - Int. J. Pharm., (20000000), vol. 203, no. 1-2, pages 1 - 60 | - Pharm. Res., (19970000), vol. 14, no. 8, pages 969 - 75 | - J. Pharm. Sci., (19981100), vol. 87, no. 11, pages 1406 - 11 |