EP3959022 - SHAPING METHOD AND SHAPING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BL Chemie GmbH & Co. KG Hönnestrasse 31 58809 Neuenrade / DE | [2022/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÜLTMANN, Andreas, Gregor, Karl Lohstraße 11 58809 Neuenrade / DE | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | Schäperklaus, Jochen, et al Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 1580 59705 Arnsberg / DE | [2022/09] | Application number, filing date | 19720560.2 | 26.04.2019 | [2022/09] | WO2019EP60803 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020216455 | Date: | 29.10.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3959022 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B21C1/22, B21C1/24, B21C1/27, B21C1/28, B21C1/32 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
B21C1/24 (EP);
B21C1/22 (EP);
B21C1/27 (EP);
B21C1/28 (EP);
B21C1/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/09] | Title | German: | UMFORMVERFAHREN UND UMFORMVORRICHTUNG | [2022/09] | English: | SHAPING METHOD AND SHAPING DEVICE | [2022/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FAÇONNAGE ET DISPOSITIF DE FAÇONNAGE | [2022/09] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 26.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/38] | 12.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]CH170512 (SINGER FRITZ [DE]) [Y] 14 * page 3, paragraph letzte Absatz - page 4, paragraph erste Absatz; figure - *; | [XY]US2927372 (POWELL VERNON R) [X] 1-13,15,17 * column 2, line 46 - column 5, line 13; figures 1-3b * [Y] 14,16; | [XY]JPS589712 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1-13,15,17 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * [Y] 14,16; | [Y]JPH01202312 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [Y] 16 * abstract ** paragraph [0001] *; | [X]DE19637686 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 9; figure - * |