EP3773595 - ANTICANCER PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS FOR COMBINED THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Berlin-Chemie AG Glienicker Weg 125 12489 Berlin / DE | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MERLINO, Giuseppe c/o Menarini Ricerche SPA Via Tito Speri 10 00071 Pomezia RM / IT | 02 /
BIGIONI, Mario c/o Menarini Ricerche SPA Via Tito Speri 10 00071 Pomezia RM / IT | 03 /
BINASCHI, Monica c/o Menarini Ricerche SPA Via Tito Speri 10 00071 Pomezia RM / IT | 04 /
PELLACANI, Andrea Menarini Ricerche S.p.A. Via dei Sette Santi 1 50131 Firenze / IT | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Di Giovine, Paolo, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza di Pietra, 38-39 00186 Roma / IT | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19721103.0 | 28.03.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019IB52541 | Priority number, date | IT20180004082 | 29.03.2018 Original published format: IT201800004082 | [2021/07] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019186451 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3773595 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3773595 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/5377, A61P35/00, A61K39/395 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
A61K31/5377 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/517 (US);
A61K31/565 (US);
A61K39/395 (IL,KR);
A61K39/3955 (IL,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K16/22 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K16/2863 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K16/32 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K2039/505 (US);
A61K2039/54 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/5377, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K39/3955, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K39/395, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | A61K31/5377, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Extension states | BA | 16.10.2020 | ME | 16.10.2020 | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN GEGEN KREBS ZUR KOMBINIERTEN THERAPIE | [2021/07] | English: | ANTICANCER PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS FOR COMBINED THERAPY | [2021/07] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES ANTICANCÉREUSES POUR THÉRAPIE COMBINÉE | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 16.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2012118978 (UNIV COLORADO REGENTS [US], et al); | [X]US2013123255 (TANIMURA HIROMI [JP], et al); | [X]WO2015095807 (BIOMED VALLEY DISCOVERIES INC [US]); | [A]EP2949326 (SAKAI TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]WO2016142508 (CENTRE LÉON-BÉRARD [FR]); |