EP3781430 - BATTERY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM HAVING SWITCH CONTROL, IN PARTICULAR FOR A RAIL VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PowerTech Converter GmbH Am Borsigturn 100 13507 Berlin / DE | For all designated states Ellenberger & Poensgen GmbH Industriestrasse 2-8 90518 Altdorf / DE | [2022/52] |
Former [2021/08] | For all designated states PowerTech Converter GmbH Am Borsigturn 100 13507 Berlin / DE | ||
For all designated states Ellenberger & Poensgen GmbH Industriestrasse 2-8 D-90518 Altdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THRON, Burkhard Niederlehmer Str. 18 15712 Königs Wusterhausen, Zernsdorf / DE | 02 /
NAUMANN, Michael Industriestraße 2-8 90518 Altdorf / DE | 03 /
BOLTZ, Hans-Joachim Am Borsigturm 100 13507 Berlin / DE | 04 /
LASKE, Olaf Am Borsigturm 100 13507 Berlin / DE | [2021/08] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2021/08] | Application number, filing date | 19721221.0 | 17.04.2019 | [2021/08] | WO2019EP59990 | Priority number, date | DE201810109594 | 20.04.2018 Original published format: DE102018109594 | [2021/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019202030 | Date: | 24.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3781430 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3781430 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60L3/04, B60L3/00, B60L58/14, H02J7/00, H01H47/22, H01H47/32, B60R16/03, H01M10/42 | [2021/08] | CPC: |
B60L3/04 (EP,US);
B60L3/0046 (EP);
B60L58/14 (EP);
H01M10/425 (EP);
H01M10/441 (EP);
H01M50/507 (EP,US);
H01M50/574 (EP,US);
H02J7/0013 (EP,US);
H02J7/0029 (EP,US);
H02J7/0031 (EP);
B60L2200/26 (EP);
H01H47/325 (EP);
H01M2010/4271 (EP);
H01M2220/20 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIEMANAGEMENTSYSTEM MIT SCHALTERSTEUERUNG, INSBESONDERE FÜR EIN SCHIENENFAHRZEUG | [2021/08] | English: | BATTERY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM HAVING SWITCH CONTROL, IN PARTICULAR FOR A RAIL VEHICLE | [2021/08] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE BATTERIE MUNI D'UNE COMMANDE DE COMMUTATEURS, EN PARTICULIER POUR UN VÉHICULE FERROVIAIRE | [2021/08] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 19.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 14.12.2022 | DK | 14.12.2022 | EE | 14.12.2022 | FI | 14.12.2022 | HR | 14.12.2022 | LT | 14.12.2022 | LV | 14.12.2022 | MC | 14.12.2022 | RO | 14.12.2022 | RS | 14.12.2022 | SE | 14.12.2022 | SI | 14.12.2022 | SM | 14.12.2022 | GR | 15.03.2023 | IS | 14.04.2023 | IE | 17.04.2023 | LU | 17.04.2023 | BE | 30.04.2023 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/12] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
LU | 17.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
LU | 17.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/04] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
LU | 17.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | EE | 14.12.2022 | |
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 14.12.2022 | |
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 14.12.2022 | Cited in | International search | [I]DE202011051972U (PCS POWER CONVERTER SOLUTIONS GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-20* the whole document * | Examination | DE202011051972U | by applicant | DE3822021 | DE10026835 | DE202011051972U | WO2017093552 |