EP3775554 - A PUMPING APPARATUS FOR DISPENSING A FLOWABLE PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hodges & Drake Design Limited 27 York Road Leicester LE1 5TT / GB | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILDE, Ronan c/o Hodges & Drake Design Ltd 27 York Road Leicester LE1 5TT / GB | 02 /
HODGES, Kevin c/o Hodges & Drake Design Ltd 27 York Road Leicester LE1 5TT / GB | [2022/15] |
Former [2021/07] | 01 /
WILDE, Ronan c/o Hodges & Drake Design Ltd 27 York Road Leicester LE1 5TT / GB | ||
02 /
HODGES, Kevin c/o Hodges & Drake Design Ltd 27 York Road Leicester LE1 5TT / GB | Representative(s) | Serjeants LLP Dock 75 Exploration Drive Leicester, LE4 5NU / GB | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19721337.4 | 28.03.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019GB50898 | Priority number, date | GB20180005144 | 29.03.2018 Original published format: GB 201805144 | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019186176 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3775554 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3775554 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F04B43/12 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
F04B43/12 (EP,GB);
F04B43/1292 (US);
F04B43/08 (GB);
F04B43/086 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PUMPVORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSGABE EINES FLIESSFÄHIGEN PRODUKTS | [2021/07] | English: | A PUMPING APPARATUS FOR DISPENSING A FLOWABLE PRODUCT | [2021/07] | French: | APPAREIL DE POMPAGE PERMETTANT DE DISTRIBUER UN PRODUIT COULANT | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 16.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 13.04.2022 | AT | 13.04.2022 | CZ | 13.04.2022 | EE | 13.04.2022 | FI | 13.04.2022 | HR | 13.04.2022 | LT | 13.04.2022 | LV | 13.04.2022 | MC | 13.04.2022 | PL | 13.04.2022 | RO | 13.04.2022 | RS | 13.04.2022 | SI | 13.04.2022 | SK | 13.04.2022 | SM | 13.04.2022 | BG | 13.07.2022 | NO | 13.07.2022 | GR | 14.07.2022 | IS | 13.08.2022 | PT | 16.08.2022 | [2023/48] |
Former [2023/25] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5709539 (HAMMER MICHAEL RON [AU], et al) [A] 1-32* figure 10 *; | [A]EP1184071 (HERAEUS KULZER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-32 * paragraphs [0022] - [0030]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2007059184 (BACH DAVID T [US]) [A] 1-32 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0025]; figures 2,4 *; | [AD]US7997448 (LEYVA ROBERT [US]) [AD] 1-32 * columns 5-10; figure 3 * | by applicant | US7997448 |