EP3790494 - METHOD FOR EVALUATING A DENTAL SITUATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2022 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dental Monitoring 75, rue de Tocqueville 75017 Paris / FR | [2023/07] |
Former [2021/11] | For all designated states Dental Monitoring 47, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALAH, Philippe 18 rue Edouard Vaillant 93170 BAGNOLET / FR | 02 /
PELLISSARD, Thomas 13 avenue Anatole France 92110 CLICHY / FR | 03 /
GHYSELINCK, Guillaume 41 rue d'Arleux 59169 CANTIN / FR | 04 /
DEBRAUX, Laurent 57 rue des cascades 75020 PARIS / FR | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/11] | Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 19721630.2 | 07.05.2019 | [2021/11] | WO2019EP61651 | Priority number, date | EP20180305571 | 09.05.2018 Original published format: EP 18305571 | EP20180305637 | 25.05.2018 Original published format: EP 18305637 | [2021/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019215129 | Date: | 14.11.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3790494 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61C7/00, A61C9/00, A61B1/32, G06Q10/10, G06T7/00, G16H30/40, G16H40/40, G16H50/50, G16H50/70, G16H50/20, G16H15/00, G06T7/60 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
A61C7/002 (EP,US);
A61B1/000096 (EP,US);
A61B1/00016 (EP);
A61B1/24 (EP);
A61B1/32 (EP);
A61C9/0053 (EP,US);
G06N3/08 (US);
G06Q10/107 (EP);
G06Q10/1095 (EP);
G06T7/0012 (EP,US);
G16H30/40 (EP);
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEURTEILUNG EINER ZAHNSITUATION | [2021/11] | English: | METHOD FOR EVALUATING A DENTAL SITUATION | [2021/11] | French: | PROCEDE D'EVALUATION D'UNE SITUATION DENTAIRE | [2021/11] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 09.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.04.2024 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN201244032Y (LIGANG SUN [CN]) [A] 1-8 * page 4 ** figure 1 *; | [I]FR3010629 (SALAH PHILIPPE [FR]) [I] 1-8 * page 5, line 1 - page 14, line 24 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US8998609 (PRAKASH MANU [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 3, line 63 - column 27, line 6 * * figures 1-13 *; | [A] - I. AHMAD, "Digital dental photography. Part 8: intra-oral set-ups", BDJ, (20090822), vol. 207, no. 4, doi:10.1038/sj.bdj.2009.715, ISSN 0007-0610, pages 151 - 157, XP055209322 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.bdj.2009.715 | [A] - Ralls ET AL, "Computer-assisted dental diagnosis", (19861030), URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pubmed/3536623, (20181218), XP055536006 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | FR3010629 | WO2015EP74896 |