EP3781283 - SUPPORT BODY FOR FILTER ELEMENTS AND FILTER ELEMENT HEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boll & Kirch Filterbau Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Siemensstraße 10-14 50170 Kerpen / DE | [2021/52] |
Former [2021/08] | For all designated states Boll & Kirch Filterbau GmbH Siemensstrasse 10-14 50170 Kerpen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RATHSMANN, Jens Willi-Brand-Straße 5 52385 Nideggen / DE | 02 /
VIETEN, Willi Zedernweg 2 41812 Erkelenz / DE | 03 /
SCHMITZ, Stefan Vochemer Straße 59 50354 Hürth / DE | [2021/08] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Buschhoff Hennicke Althaus Kaiser-Wilhelm-Ring 24 50672 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/08] | Hennicke, Ernst Rüdiger Patentanwälte Buschhoff-Hennicke-Althaus Kaiser-Wilhelm-Ring 24 50672 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 19721848.0 | 10.04.2019 | [2021/08] | WO2019IB52947 | Priority number, date | DE201820102161U | 18.04.2018 Original published format: DE 202018102161 U | [2021/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019202438 | Date: | 24.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3781283 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B01D29/13, B01D29/15, B01D29/17 | [2021/08] | CPC: |
B01D29/15 (EP);
B01D29/13 (EP);
B01D29/17 (EP);
B01D2201/0415 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] | Title | German: | STÜTZKÖRPER FÜR FILTERELEMENTE UND FILTERELEMENT DAMIT | [2021/08] | English: | SUPPORT BODY FOR FILTER ELEMENTS AND FILTER ELEMENT HEREWITH | [2021/08] | French: | CORPS DE SUPPORT POUR DES ÉLÉMENTS FILTRANTS ET ÉLÉMENT FILTRANT ASSOCIÉ | [2021/08] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 18.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2001179010 (KANAI HIROAKI) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [YA]DE202006001793U (BOLL & KIRCH FILTER [DE]) [Y] 3-15 * the whole document * [A] 1,2; | [AD]DE102016002145 (DONALDSON FILTRATION DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XY]CN206924474U (SHANGHAI GUCH NUCLEAR PORE MEMBRANE TECH CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0042] , [0043]; figures 1-7 * [Y] 3-15 | by applicant | DE202006001793U | DE102016002145 |