EP3785074 - ELECTROCHROMIC DEVICES COMPRISING TUNGSTEN TITANIUM MOLYBDENUM OXIDE AS ELECTROCHROMIC MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states View, Inc. 195 South Milpitas Boulevard Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROZBICKI, Robert T. 195 South Milpitas Blvd. Milpitas, California 95035 / US | 02 /
KAILASAM, Sridhar Karthik 195 South Milpitas Blvd. Milpitas, California 95035 / US | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [2024/12] |
Former [2021/09] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 19721938.9 | 17.04.2019 | [2021/09] | WO2019US27931 | Priority number, date | US201862662034P | 24.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862662034 P | US201916384822 | 15.04.2019 Original published format: US201916384822 | [2021/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019209593 | Date: | 31.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3785074 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3785074 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1524, // C09K9/00 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
G02F1/1524 (EP);
G02F1/1506 (US);
C09K9/00 (EP,US);
C23C14/08 (US);
C23C14/083 (US);
C23C14/085 (US);
C23C14/14 (US);
C23C14/34 (US);
C23C14/3464 (US);
C23C14/568 (US);
G02F1/1525 (US);
G02F1/155 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/09] | G02F1/1524 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROCHROME VORRICHTUNGEN MIT WOLFRAM-TITAN-MOLYBDÄN-OXID ALS ELEKTROCHROMES MATERIAL | [2021/09] | English: | ELECTROCHROMIC DEVICES COMPRISING TUNGSTEN TITANIUM MOLYBDENUM OXIDE AS ELECTROCHROMIC MATERIAL | [2021/09] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ÉLECTROCHROMIQUES COMPRENANT DE L'OXYDE DE TUNGSTÈNE-TITANE-MOLYBDÈNE EN TANT QUE MATÉRIAU ÉLECTROCHROMIQUE | [2021/09] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 30.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 05.07.2021 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 14.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24163767.7 / EP4365261 | Request for further processing for: | 14.09.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 14.09.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.09.2021 | Decision despatched | Loss of rights: Claims | 14.09.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 14.09.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.09.2021 | Decision despatched | 14.09.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 14.09.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.09.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 20.03.2024 | FI | 20.03.2024 | HR | 20.03.2024 | LT | 20.03.2024 | LV | 20.03.2024 | NL | 20.03.2024 | SE | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.06.2024 | RS | 20.06.2024 | GR | 21.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
SE | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 20.03.2024 | |
NO | 20.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2010243427 (KOZLOWSKI MARK [US], et al); | [YA]US2017255076 (GILLASPIE DANE [US], et al); | [YA]US2017357135 (GILLASPIE DANE [US], et al); | [YA]US2017371221 (GILLASPIE DANE [US], et al); | by applicant | US8164818 | US8300298 | US8764951 | US8764950 | US9261751 | US9454053 | US9664974 | US20100941882 |