EP3793488 - ARTIFICIAL FOOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mecuris GmbH Lindwurmstrasse 11 80337 München / DE | [2021/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BREUNINGER, Jannis Amselweg 48 72663 Großbettlingen / DE | 02 /
GLAS, Franziska Fürstenrieder Straße 41 80686 München / DE | 03 /
ROCHLITZ, Bence Endelhauserstr. 22 80686 München / DE | 04 /
TAUBMANN, Carolin Mosenberg 75 91284 Neuhaus / DE | 05 /
RIETH, Clemens Tübingerstrasse 157 71032 Böblingen / DE | [2021/12] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [2023/23] |
Former [2021/12] | Würmser, Julian Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19722896.8 | 08.05.2019 | [2021/12] | WO2019EP61839 | Priority number, date | DE201820102690U | 14.05.2018 Original published format: DE 202018102690 U | [2021/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019219483 | Date: | 21.11.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3793488 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3793488 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/66 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
A61F2/66 (EP,US);
A61F2/5046 (US);
A61F2002/6614 (EP);
A61F2002/6642 (US);
A61F2002/665 (US);
A61F2002/6657 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KUNSTFUSS | [2021/12] | English: | ARTIFICIAL FOOT | [2021/12] | French: | PIED ARTIFICIEL | [2021/12] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 10.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 20.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 20.01.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 20.01.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.01.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/08] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | NO | 07.09.2023 | |
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NO | 07.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB306313 (JOHAN PHILIP DAHLLOF) [A] 1-13 * Abbildung 2, Seite 1, Zeile 78-90 *; | [A]WO0106965 (GRAMTEC INNOVATION AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-13 * Abbildung 1, Seite 3, Zeile 15-27 *; | [A]US2010042228 (DODDROE JEFFREY L [US], et al) [A] 1-13* Abbildung 1a, Absatz [37-39] *; | [A]DE102015101746 (KRAMSKI GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * Abbildung 1, Absatz [45-48] * | by applicant | DE102014006727 | DE202015007994U |