EP3807478 - AN HEAD FOR A SUPPORT OF RAISED FLOORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): EE, SK | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Profilitec S.p.A. Socio Unico Via Scotte,3 36033 Isola Vicentina / IT | [2021/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BASSETTO, Andrea Via Scotte, 3 36033 Isola Vicentina (VI) / IT | 02 /
EGLI, Roderick Via Scotte, 3 36033 Isola Vicentina (VI) / IT | [2021/16] | Representative(s) | Trentin, Michele Eureka IP Consulting Via Giovanni Lanza, 40-44 36100 Vicenza / IT | [2021/16] | Application number, filing date | 19723201.0 | 20.03.2019 | [2021/16] | WO2019IB52263 | Priority number, date | IT20180006344 | 15.06.2018 Original published format: IT201800006344 | [2021/16] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019239221 | Date: | 19.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3807478 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3807478 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/024, E04F15/02 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
E04F15/02464 (EP);
E04F15/0247 (EP,US);
E04F15/02452 (US);
E04F15/02183 (US);
E04F2015/02127 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOPF FÜR EINE STÜTZE VON ZWISCHENBÖDEN | [2021/16] | English: | AN HEAD FOR A SUPPORT OF RAISED FLOORS | [2021/16] | French: | TÊTE DESTINÉE À UN SUPPORT DE FAUX PLANCHERS | [2021/16] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2019 | Translation filed | 15.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/16] | 15.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.07.2023 | CZ | 12.07.2023 | DK | 12.07.2023 | EE | 12.07.2023 | FI | 12.07.2023 | HR | 12.07.2023 | LT | 12.07.2023 | LV | 12.07.2023 | NL | 12.07.2023 | PL | 12.07.2023 | RO | 12.07.2023 | RS | 12.07.2023 | SE | 12.07.2023 | SK | 12.07.2023 | SM | 12.07.2023 | NO | 12.10.2023 | GR | 13.10.2023 | IS | 12.11.2023 | PT | 13.11.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/22] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 12.07.2023 | |
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 12.07.2023 | Cited in | International search | [YA]EP0123875 (ROBERTSON BAUELEMENTE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,3-5 * figures 3, 10 * * page 10, line 21 - page 11, line 1 * [A] 2; | [Y]WO2014160076 (IPE CLIP FASTENER COMPANY LLC [US], et al) [Y] 3 * figure 4C ** paragraph [0021] *; | [YA]CN206917190U (HUZHOU XINFENG WOOD PLASTIC COMPOSITE CO LTD) [Y] 1,3-5 * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0030] * [A] 2 |