EP3787915 - AIR CONDITIONING DEVICE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE, IN PARTICULAR FOR A UTILITY VEHICLE, METHOD FOR OPERATING AN AIR CONDITIONING DEVICE OF THIS KIND, AND MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70372 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CALATAYUD, Jose, Luis Jagststrasse 43 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 02 /
FREY, Thomas Rotsandweg 23 67657 Kaiserslautern / DE | 03 /
HAFNER, Michael Wilhelm-Busch-Str. 9 68519 Viernheim / DE | [2021/10] | Representative(s) | Thoms, Frank Daimler Brand & IP Management GmbH & Co. KG 063 - H512 70546 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/10] | Application number, filing date | 19723315.8 | 10.04.2019 | [2021/10] | WO2019EP59160 | Priority number, date | DE20181003530 | 30.04.2018 Original published format: DE102018003530 | [2021/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019211069 | Date: | 07.11.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3787915 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00, B60H1/32, F25B30/02 | [2021/10] | CPC: |
B60H1/00907 (EP,US);
B60H1/00392 (EP);
B60H1/3213 (EP);
B60H1/32281 (EP);
F25B13/00 (EP);
F25B40/00 (EP);
F25B41/20 (EP,US);
F25B49/02 (EP);
B60H2001/00928 (EP);
B60H2001/00949 (EP);
B60H2001/00957 (EP);
F25B2309/061 (EP);
F25B2313/021 (EP);
F25B2313/02331 (EP);
F25B2313/02344 (EP);
F25B9/008 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/10] | Title | German: | KLIMATISIERUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG, INSBESONDERE FÜR EIN NUTZFAHRZEUG, SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER SOLCHEN KLIMATISIERUNGSEINRICHTUNG UND KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2021/10] | English: | AIR CONDITIONING DEVICE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE, IN PARTICULAR FOR A UTILITY VEHICLE, METHOD FOR OPERATING AN AIR CONDITIONING DEVICE OF THIS KIND, AND MOTOR VEHICLE | [2021/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CLIMATISATION D'UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE, EN PARTICULIER D'UN VÉHICULE UTILITAIRE, PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF DE CLIMATISATION ET VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2021/10] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/10] | 27.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102015015125 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102015122721 (HANON SYSTEMS [KR]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0068] - [0072]; figures 3e,3f * | by applicant | EP2660086 | DE102014203895 |