EP3784721 - NON-FOAM POLYOLEFIN COMPOSITIONS FOR WIRE AND CABLE COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2023/39] |
Former [2021/09] | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PUJARI, Saswati 400 Arcola Road Collegeville, Pennsylvania 19426 / US | 02 /
TALREJA, Manish 400 Arcola Road Collegeville, Pennsylvania 19426 / US | 03 /
ESSEGHIR, Mohamed 400 Arcola Road Collegeville, Pennsylvania 19426 / US | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2023/39] |
Former [2021/09] | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | Application number, filing date | 19723550.0 | 11.04.2019 | [2021/09] | WO2019US27001 | Priority number, date | US201862663390P | 27.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862663390 P | [2021/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019209546 | Date: | 31.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3784721 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3784721 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/24, C08L23/08, H01B3/44 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
C08L23/0815 (EP,US);
C08L23/06 (KR,US);
C08K3/30 (US);
C08K5/57 (US);
C08L23/26 (KR,US);
C08L51/06 (US);
H01B3/441 (EP,KR,US);
C08K2003/309 (US);
C08L2203/202 (KR,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US);
C08L2207/062 (US);
C08L2207/064 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08L23/0815, C08K3/04, C08K5/0025, C08L51/06 (EP);
C08L23/0815, C08K3/04, C08K5/57, C08L51/06 (EP);
C08L23/0815, C08K5/0025, C08L51/06 (EP);
C08L23/0815, C08K5/57, C08L51/06 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NICHTSCHÄUMENDE POLYOLEFINZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR DRAHT- UND KABELBESCHICHTUNG | [2021/09] | English: | NON-FOAM POLYOLEFIN COMPOSITIONS FOR WIRE AND CABLE COATING | [2021/09] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE POLYOLÉFINE NON MOUSSANTES POUR L'ENROBAGE DE FILS ET DE CÂBLES | [2021/09] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 17.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.09.2023 | CZ | 27.09.2023 | DK | 27.09.2023 | EE | 27.09.2023 | ES | 27.09.2023 | FI | 27.09.2023 | HR | 27.09.2023 | LT | 27.09.2023 | LV | 27.09.2023 | NL | 27.09.2023 | PL | 27.09.2023 | RO | 27.09.2023 | RS | 27.09.2023 | SE | 27.09.2023 | SK | 27.09.2023 | SM | 27.09.2023 | NO | 27.12.2023 | GR | 28.12.2023 | IS | 27.01.2024 | PT | 29.01.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 27.09.2023 | |
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0412518 (UNION CARBIDE CHEM PLASTIC [US]); | [X]WO0138433 (SHAW IND LTD [CA], et al); | [X]US2003050401 (JACKSON PETER [CA], et al); | [A]US2004024138 (ALLERMANN GERD ARTHUR [BE]); | [A]WO2007032885 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al); | [I]EP2226355 (SHAWCOR LTD [CA]) | by applicant | US3646155 | US4144202 | US5246783 | US5266627 | US5272236 | US5278272 | US5986028 | US6048935 | US6496629 | US6714707 | US7355089 | US7504347 | US7514517 | US7524911 | US7579408 | US7582716 |