EP3790668 - MOBILE SCREEN BODY AND MOBILE MINERAL MATERIAL PROCESSING PLANT WITH SUPPORT LEGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metso Outotec Finland Oy Lokomonkatu 3 33900 Tampere / FI | [2021/24] |
Former [2021/11] | For all designated states Metso Minerals, Inc. Lokomonkatu 3 33900 Tampere / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KYKYRI, Tommi c/o Metso Minerals, Inc., Lokomonkatu 3 33900 Tampere / FI | 02 /
SALO, Lasse c/o Metso Minerals, Inc., Lokomonkatu 3 33900 Tampere / FI | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | Espatent Oy Kaivokatu 10 D 00100 Helsinki / FI | [2021/11] | Application number, filing date | 19723836.3 | 06.05.2019 | [2021/11] | WO2019FI50349 | Priority number, date | FI20180000063 | 08.05.2018 Original published format: FI 20180063 | [2021/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019215387 | Date: | 14.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3790668 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3790668 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B07B1/00 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
B07B1/005 (EP,FI,US);
B07B1/46 (FI);
B02C21/02 (EP,FI);
B02C23/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOBILER SIEBKÖRPER UND MOBILE MINERALSTOFFVERARBEITUNGSANLAGE MIT STÜTZBEINEN | [2021/11] | English: | MOBILE SCREEN BODY AND MOBILE MINERAL MATERIAL PROCESSING PLANT WITH SUPPORT LEGS | [2021/11] | French: | CORPS DE TAMIS MOBILE ET INSTALLATION DE TRAITEMENT DE MATIÈRE MINÉRALE MOBILE DOTÉE DE PIEDS DE SUPPORT | [2021/11] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 09.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 19.10.2022 | CZ | 19.10.2022 | DK | 19.10.2022 | EE | 19.10.2022 | ES | 19.10.2022 | IT | 19.10.2022 | LT | 19.10.2022 | LV | 19.10.2022 | MC | 19.10.2022 | NL | 19.10.2022 | PL | 19.10.2022 | SI | 19.10.2022 | SK | 19.10.2022 | SM | 19.10.2022 | GR | 20.01.2023 | IS | 19.02.2023 | PT | 20.02.2023 | GB | 06.05.2023 | IE | 06.05.2023 | LU | 06.05.2023 | BE | 31.05.2023 | CH | 31.05.2023 | FR | 31.05.2023 | LI | 31.05.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
GB | 06.05.2023 | ||
IE | 06.05.2023 | ||
LU | 06.05.2023 | ||
BE | 31.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
FR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
IE | 06.05.2023 | ||
LU | 06.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
LU | 06.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
LU | 06.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | CZ | 19.10.2022 | |
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | DK | 19.10.2022 | |
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | DK | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | ES | 19.10.2022 | |
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | ES | 19.10.2022 | |
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | ES | 19.10.2022 | |
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 19.10.2022 | |
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 19.10.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3119946 (ORENSTEIN & KOPPEL AG [DE]) [A] 1,3,9-11,15 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - line 4 * * page 4, line 11 - line 21 * * claim . * * figure - *; | [A]DE19600897 (H AUG SCHMIDT TRANSPORTANLAGEN [DE]) [A] 1,8-13,15 * abstract * * column 1, line 3 - line 10 * * column 4, line 48 - column 5, line 13 * * claim - * * figure - *; | [A]US2001020656 (FRICK DIETMAR [AT]) [A] 1,8-11,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030] * * claim - * * figure - *; | [A]US2003146315 (BOAST IAN [GB]) [A] 1-5,11-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0039] * * claim - * * figure - *; | [XYI]US8820536 (SCHIRM PAYTON [US]) [X] 1-5,11-13,15 * abstract * * column 3, line 34 - line 38 * * column 3, line 56 - line 60 * * column 4, line 12 - line 43 * * column 5, line 35 - line 48 * * column 6, line 21 - line 28 * * claim - * * figure - * [Y] 14 [I] 6-10; | [YA]WO2015033013 (METSO MINERALS INC [FI]) [Y] 14 * abstract * * page 4, line 8 - line 12 * * page 11, line 3 - page 12, line 14 * * page 16, line 10 - page 18, line 13 * * claim - * * figure - * [A] 1,2,4-6,9-13,15; | [A]EP3061511 (SUPERIOR INDUSTRIES [US]) [A] 1,3,4,6-8,11-13,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033] * * claim - ** figure - *; | [A]DE202017104017U (KÖNIG ERNST WILHELM [DE]) [A] 1,2,4-6,8,11-13,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0021] * * claim - * * figure - * |