EP3790855 - METHOD FOR ISOLATION OF AN AROMATIC DIANHYDRIDE AND AROMATIC DIANHYDRIDES PREPARED BY THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHPP Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [2021/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERIYASAMY, Sivakumar Plot No. 81 to 85 Village:Chikkadunnasandra Anekal: Taulk, Off. Sarjapura - Attibele Road Karnataka Bangalore 562 125 / IN | 02 /
PADMANABHAN, Simon 1 Lexan Lane Mt. Vernon, Indiana 47620 / US | 03 /
WERLING, Robert 1 Lexan Lane Mt. Vernon, Indiana 47620 / US | 04 /
GAUTAM, Ravi Plot No. 81 to 85 Village:Chikkadunnasandra Anekal: Taulk, Off. Sarjapura - Attibele Road Karnataka Bangalore 562 125 / IN | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | Balder IP Law, S.L. Paseo de la Castellana 93 5ª planta 28046 Madrid / ES | [2021/11] | Application number, filing date | 19724062.5 | 06.05.2019 | [2021/11] | WO2019US30810 | Priority number, date | EP20180171060 | 07.05.2018 Original published format: EP 18171060 | [2021/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019217257 | Date: | 14.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3790855 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3790855 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07C51/06, C07C63/313, C07D209/48, C07D307/89 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
C07C51/06 (EP);
C07D405/12 (US);
C07D307/89 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/06, C07C65/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND ISOLIERUNG EINES AROMATISCHEN DIANHYDRIDS | [2024/04] | English: | METHOD FOR ISOLATION OF AN AROMATIC DIANHYDRIDE AND AROMATIC DIANHYDRIDES PREPARED BY THE METHOD | [2021/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET D'ISOLATION D'UN DIANHYDRIDE AROMATIQUE | [2024/04] |
Former [2021/11] | VERFAHREN ZUR ISOLIERUNG EINES AROMATISCHEN DIANHYDRIDS UND DURCH DIESES VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTE AROMATISCHE DIANHYDRIDE | ||
Former [2021/11] | PROCÉDÉ D'ISOLATION D'UN DIANHYDRIDE AROMATIQUE ET DIANHYDRIDES AROMATIQUES PRÉPARÉS PAR LE PROCÉDÉ | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 22.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO2017189293 (SABIC GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES BV [NL], et al) |