EP3788831 - FULL DUPLEX OPPORTUNITY DISCOVERY AND TRANSMISSION FOR ASYMMETRIC FULL DUPLEX WIRELESS LOCAL AREA NETWORKS (WLANS) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital Patent Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway, Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [2023/11] |
Former [2021/10] | For all designated states Interdigital Patent Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway, Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OTERI, Oghenekome 8488 Lower Scarborough Lane San Diego, CA 92127 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Guodong 111 West 33rd Street 14th Floor New York, NY 10120 / US | 03 /
SUN, Li-Hsiang 9276 Scranton Road Suite 300 San Diego, CA 92121-1787 / US | 04 /
OLESEN, Robert L. 3 Country Club Drive Huntington, NY 11743 / US | [2021/10] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [2021/10] | Application number, filing date | 19725459.2 | 03.05.2019 | [2021/10] | WO2019US30659 | Priority number, date | US201862666523P | 03.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862666523 P | [2021/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019213565 | Date: | 07.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3788831 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/00, H04L5/14, H04W74/02, H04W84/12 | [2021/10] | CPC: |
H04W74/02 (EP,CN);
H04L5/14 (EP,CN,US);
H04W74/0816 (CN,US);
H04L5/0037 (EP,CN);
H04L5/0048 (EP,CN);
H04L5/0092 (EP,CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/10] | Title | German: | ENTDECKUNG UND ÜBERTRAGUNG VON VOLLDUPLEX-GELEGENHEIT FÜR ASYMMETRISCHE LOKALE VOLLDUPLEX-DRAHTLOSNETZWERKE (WLANS) | [2021/10] | English: | FULL DUPLEX OPPORTUNITY DISCOVERY AND TRANSMISSION FOR ASYMMETRIC FULL DUPLEX WIRELESS LOCAL AREA NETWORKS (WLANS) | [2021/10] | French: | DÉCOUVERTE ET TRANSMISSION D'OPPORTUNITÉ EN DUPLEX INTÉGRAL POUR RÉSEAUX LOCAUX SANS FIL EN DUPLEX INTÉGRAL ASYMÉTRIQUE (WLAN) | [2021/10] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/10] | 02.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2015172038 (JIANG ANMING [CN], et al); | [XI]US2018091283 (WANG PING [US], et al); | [A]US2018091284 (MIN ALEXANDER W [US], et al) |