EP3804423 - RANGING BETWEEN A USER EQUIPMENT AND A FIXED REFERENCE NODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIANG, Libin Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
JOSE, Jubin Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
LI, Junyi Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
NIESEN, Urs Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/15] | Howe, Steven Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 19725806.4 | 01.05.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019US30237 | Priority number, date | US201862678250P | 30.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862678250 P | US201916399460 | 30.04.2019 Original published format: US201916399460 | [2021/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019231605 | Date: | 05.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3804423 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W64/00, H04W72/04, H04W74/04, G01S5/02, H04W72/00 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
G01S5/0236 (EP);
H04W72/54 (US);
G01S11/02 (EP);
G01S5/14 (EP);
H04L43/0864 (EP,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04L5/0094 (EP);
H04L5/1438 (EP,US);
H04W24/06 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Title | German: | ENTFERNUNGSMESSUNG ZWISCHEN EINEM BENUTZERGERÄT UND EINEM FESTEN REFERENZKNOTEN | [2021/15] | English: | RANGING BETWEEN A USER EQUIPMENT AND A FIXED REFERENCE NODE | [2021/15] | French: | TELEMETRIE ENTRE UN EQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR ET UN NOEUD DE REFERENCE FIXE | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 24.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2010103903 (PARK JONG RO [US], et al) [Y] 10,12,26,28* paragraphs [0049] , [ 0060] *; | [Y]US2013235768 (EARNSHAW ANDREW MARK [CA], et al) [Y] 2,3,8,9,13,17,18,23-25 * paragraphs [0002] , [ 0039] *; | [XY]US2014334401 (ZHANG XIAOXIN [US], et al) [X] 1,4,11,14-16,19,27,29,30 * paragraphs [0005] , [ 0010] , [ 0041] , [ 0048] , [ 0051] , [ 0056] , [ 0065] , [ 0074] * [Y] 2,3,5-10,12,13,17,18,20-26,28; | [Y]US2016366554 (MARKHOVSKY FELIX [US], et al) [Y] 5-7,20-22 * paragraphs [0305] , [0347] * |