EP3777007 - METHODS, DEVICES AND COMPUTER PROGRAMS FOR THE ENCIPHERMENT AND DECIPHERMENT OF DATA FOR THE TRANSMISSION OR STORAGE OF DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ben-Naser, Youssef 35 rue de l'Erable 77700 Serris / FR | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/07] | Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs-Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 19726049.0 | 10.04.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019FR50845 | Priority number, date | FR20180000295 | 10.04.2018 Original published format: FR 1800295 | [2021/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019197780 | Date: | 17.10.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3777007 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/06, G09C1/00, H04N21/266 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
H04L9/065 (EP);
G09C1/00 (EP);
H04L9/0668 (EP);
H04N21/26606 (EP);
H04L2209/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNGEN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMME ZUR VERSCHLÜSSELUNG UND ENTSCHLÜSSELUNG VON DATEN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG ODER SPEICHERUNG VON DATEN | [2021/07] | English: | METHODS, DEVICES AND COMPUTER PROGRAMS FOR THE ENCIPHERMENT AND DECIPHERMENT OF DATA FOR THE TRANSMISSION OR STORAGE OF DATA | [2021/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉS, DISPOSITIFS ET PROGRAMMES D'ORDINATEUR POUR LE CHIFFREMENT ET LE DÉCHIFFREMENT DE DONNÉES POUR LA TRANSMISSION OU LE STOCKAGE DE DONNÉES | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 10.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/12] | 22.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.2021 | 30.04.2022 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   13.10.2022 | 30.04.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0615361 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [X] 1,10 * column 3, line 46 - column 6, line 26 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]WO2016096000 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-15 * page 8, line 26 - page 30, line 37 *; | [X] - DVB ORGANIZATION, "tm-cbms2337r1_ts_102474v010301d - SPP Rev D (18Crypt new).doc", DVB, DIGITAL VIDEO BROADCASTING, C/O EBU - 17A ANCIENNE ROUTE - CH-1218 GRAND SACONNEX, GENEVA - SWITZERLAND, (20091113), XP017806099 [X] 1-15 * page 22 - page 40 * * page 83 - page 89 * | [A] - Ebu Project Group B/ca, "Functional model of a conditional access system", EBU Technical Review, (19950101), URL: https://tech.ebu.ch/docs/techreview/trev_266-ca.pdf, (20190116), XP055543338 [A] 1-15 |