EP3788235 - SELF-DRILLING HYBRID ROCK ANCHOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Epiroc Drilling Tools Aktiebolag Björnbacksvägen 2 73725 Fagersta / SE | [2021/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNOX, Greig c/o 109 Adcock Ingram Avenue, Aeroton 1457 Johannesburg / ZA | 02 /
SHEPPARD, James William c/o 109 Adcock Ingram Avenue, Aeroton 1457 Johannesburg / ZA | 03 /
BERGHORST, Adrian c/o 109 Adcock Ingram Avenue, Aeroton 1457 Johannesburg / ZA | [2021/10] | Representative(s) | Adamson Jones Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/10] | Adamson Jones BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GF / GB | Application number, filing date | 19726876.6 | 03.05.2019 | [2021/10] | WO2019ZA50024 | Priority number, date | ZA20180002885 | 03.05.2018 Original published format: ZA 201802885 | ZA20180006341 | 21.09.2018 Original published format: ZA 201806341 | [2021/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019213675 | Date: | 07.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3788235 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3788235 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E21D21/00 | [2021/10] | CPC: |
E21D21/0053 (EP,US);
E21D20/00 (US);
E21D21/0033 (US);
E21D21/004 (EP,US);
E21D21/008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELBSTBOHRENDER HYBRID-FELSENANKER | [2022/02] | English: | SELF-DRILLING HYBRID ROCK ANCHOR | [2021/10] | French: | ANCRAGE DE ROCHE HYBRIDE AUTO-FORAGE | [2022/02] |
Former [2021/10] | SELBSTBOHRENDER HYBRIDER FELSANKER | ||
Former [2021/10] | ANCRE POUR ROCHE HYBRIDE À AUTO-FORAGE | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/10] | 29.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 29.06.2022 | AT | 29.06.2022 | CZ | 29.06.2022 | DK | 29.06.2022 | EE | 29.06.2022 | HR | 29.06.2022 | IT | 29.06.2022 | LT | 29.06.2022 | LV | 29.06.2022 | MC | 29.06.2022 | NL | 29.06.2022 | PL | 29.06.2022 | RO | 29.06.2022 | RS | 29.06.2022 | SI | 29.06.2022 | SK | 29.06.2022 | SM | 29.06.2022 | BG | 29.09.2022 | GR | 30.09.2022 | IS | 29.10.2022 | PT | 31.10.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | HR | 29.06.2022 | |
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | HR | 29.06.2022 | |
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | HR | 29.06.2022 | |
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | LT | 29.06.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2009114402 (MOCIVNIK JOSEF [AT], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 3, paragraph 28 - page 4, paragraph 41; figure 1 *; | [A]US2011131787 (MORONEY GEOFFERY JOHN [AU], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 5, paragraph 53; figure 7 *; | [A]US2015204152 (BOEHM KARL [AT], et al) [A] 1* figure 3 *; | [A]AU2015204352 (GROUND SUPPORT SERVICES PTY LTD [AU]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO2017190397 (XU GUOAN [CN]) [A] 1 * figure 3 *; | [A]US2018112529 (MCLAREN MATTHEW DAVID [AU]) [A] 1-10 * page 4, paragraph 109 - paragraph 114; figure 1C * |