EP3965704 - CONSTRAINING MECHANISMS FOR SELECTIVE DEPLOYMENT AND ASSOCIATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W. L. Gore & Associates, Inc. 555 Paper Mill Road Newark, DE 19711 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2023/33] | For all designated states W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc. 555 Paper Mill Rd. Newark, DE 19711 / US | ||
Former [2022/11] | For all designated states W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc. 555 Paper Mill Road Newark DE 19711 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROYLES, Michael R. 555 Paper Mill Road Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | 02 /
STASTKA, Jerry J. 555 Paper Mill Road Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2022/11] | Application number, filing date | 19727205.7 | 10.05.2019 | [2022/11] | WO2019US31761 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020231387 | Date: | 19.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3965704 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/97, D04B21/00 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
A61F2/97 (EP);
A61F2/95 (US);
A61F2002/9511 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Title | German: | ZWANGSMECHANISMEN ZUR SELEKTIVEN ENTFALTUNG UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN | [2022/11] | English: | CONSTRAINING MECHANISMS FOR SELECTIVE DEPLOYMENT AND ASSOCIATED METHODS | [2022/11] | French: | MÉCANISMES DE CONTRAINTE POUR DÉPLOIEMENT SÉLECTIF ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2022/11] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 18.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US6224627 (ARMSTRONG JOSEPH ROBERT [US], et al); | [A]US2004122503 (CAMPBELL CAREY V [US], et al); | [A]US2013123900 (EBLACAS JULIO E [US], et al); | [XA]US2014277363 (ARMSTRONG JOSEPH R [US], et al); | [XA]WO2019075069 (GORE & ASS [US]) |