EP3788385 - WIND TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Promecon Process Measurement Control GmbH Steinfeldstr. 5 39179 Barleben / DE | [2021/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONRADS, Hans Georg Wallmodenstraße 60 30625 Hannover / DE | 02 /
MÄDE, Matthias Birkenweg 2 39167 Eichenbarleben / DE | [2021/10] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Volker Sperling, Fischer & Heyner Patentanwälte Bruno-Wille-Straße 9 39108 Magdeburg / DE | [2021/10] | Application number, filing date | 19727926.8 | 26.04.2019 | [2021/10] | WO2019DE00114 | Priority number, date | DE20181003608 | 03.05.2018 Original published format: DE102018003608 | [2021/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019210892 | Date: | 07.11.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3788385 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3788385 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01P5/08, G01P5/20, G01P5/22, G01P13/04, F03D17/00, F03D7/02 | [2021/10] | CPC: |
G01P5/08 (EP,KR,US);
F03D7/0204 (EP,KR,US);
F03D17/00 (EP,KR,US);
G01P13/045 (EP,KR,US);
G01P5/20 (EP,KR,US);
G01P5/22 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WINDKRAFTMASCHINE | [2021/10] | English: | WIND TURBINE | [2021/10] | French: | ÉOLIENNE | [2021/10] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/10] | 27.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 12.10.2022 | EE | 12.10.2022 | HR | 12.10.2022 | LT | 12.10.2022 | LV | 12.10.2022 | MC | 12.10.2022 | PL | 12.10.2022 | RS | 12.10.2022 | SI | 12.10.2022 | SK | 12.10.2022 | SM | 12.10.2022 | LU | 26.04.2023 | [2024/09] |
Former [2024/04] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SI | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
LU | 26.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SI | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 12.10.2022 | |
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HR | 12.10.2022 | |
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | HR | 12.10.2022 | |
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | LT | 12.10.2022 | |
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 12.10.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19651611 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [AD]EP1288494 (RITZINGER ROBERT DIPL ING [DE]); | [AD]EP0970308 (FORSKNINGSCT RISO [DK]); | [A]DE102012014260 (PROMECON PROZES UND MESTECHNIK CONRADS GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | EP0970308 | EP1288494 | DE102015003069 |