EP3797082 - TRANSFER STATION CONFIGURED TO HANDLE CARGO AND CARGO RECEPTACLE SORTING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pick8Ship Technology AG Richtistrasse 7 8304 Wallisellen / CH | [2021/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAID, Josef A. Schützenrütistrasse 13 8044 Gockhausen / CH | [2021/13] | Representative(s) | Rentsch Partner AG Kirchenweg 8 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2021/13] | Rentsch Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 203 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 19728334.4 | 22.05.2019 | [2021/13] | WO2019EP63271 | Priority number, date | CH20180000634 | 22.05.2018 Original published format: CH 6342018 | [2021/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019224282 | Date: | 28.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3797082 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B65G65/00, B65D33/02, B65G1/137 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
B65G65/00 (EP,US);
B65G1/1375 (US);
B65G1/0492 (US);
G06Q10/08 (EP,US);
B65G2201/0258 (EP,US);
B65G2209/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/13] | Title | German: | TRANSFERSTATION FÜR FRACHTUMSCHLAG UND VERFAHREN ZUR SORTIERUNG VON FRACHTBEHÄLTERN | [2021/13] | English: | TRANSFER STATION CONFIGURED TO HANDLE CARGO AND CARGO RECEPTACLE SORTING METHOD | [2021/13] | French: | STATION DE TRANSFERT CONÇUE POUR MANIPULER UN CHARGEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRI DE RÉCIPIENT DE CHARGEMENT | [2021/13] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/13] | 18.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE3247960 (ANGELE EDUARD) [X] 1,5,6 * page 6, paragraph l - page 7, paragraph 1; figure 1 * [I] 2,3,14; | [XI]EP0235488 (REDOUTE CATALOGUE SA [FR]) [X] 1,4,7-13,15-18 * abstract * [I] 14; | [XI]EP0302205 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]) [X] 1,8,9,12,15,16 * page 14; figure -; claims 1-6 * [I] 14; | [X]JPH01176706 (NIPPON YUSOKI CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2014056672 (MATHYS ANDRE [CH], et al) [A] 14 * paragraph [0113]; figures 4A,4B *; | [A]WO2017138377 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3,5,6* figures 3,4,20 *; | [X]US2018022548 (MATTERN THOMAS [DE], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0044]; figures 1,2 * |