EP3803316 - METHOD FOR DIAGNOSING THE OPERATION OF A TURBOCHARGER ADAPTED TO THE SEVERITY OF THE FAILURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PSA Automobiles SA 2-10 boulevard de l'Europe 78300 Poissy / FR | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEMAITRE, Charles 9 rue Merey 27730 EPIEDS / FR | 02 /
LEGROS, Jean Francois 72 rue de la belle épine 78650 BEYNES / FR | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 19728505.9 | 06.05.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019FR51035 | Priority number, date | FR20180054480 | 28.05.2018 Original published format: FR 1854480 | [2021/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019229312 | Date: | 05.12.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3803316 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01M15/14, G01M15/04, F02D41/22, F02B37/24, F02B39/16, F04D27/02, F02D41/00, F02B37/18 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
G01M15/042 (EP);
F02B37/183 (EP);
F02B37/24 (EP);
F02B39/16 (EP);
F02D41/0007 (EP);
F02D41/221 (EP);
F04D27/0246 (EP);
F04D27/0253 (EP);
G01M15/14 (EP);
F02B2039/162 (EP);
F05D2220/40 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP);
Y02T10/40 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/15] | G01M15/04, F02D41/22, F02B37/24, F02B39/16, F04D27/02, F02D41/00, G01M15/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Title | German: | AN DIE SCHWERE DES AUSFALLS ANGEPASSTES VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSE DES BETRIEBS EINES TURBOLADERS | [2021/15] | English: | METHOD FOR DIAGNOSING THE OPERATION OF A TURBOCHARGER ADAPTED TO THE SEVERITY OF THE FAILURE | [2021/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DIAGNOSTIC DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN TURBOCOMPRESSEUR ADAPTE A LA GRAVITE DE LA DEFAILLANCE | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 14.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/49] | 19.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2016108803 (ONO TAKAHIKO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0035] *; | [A]WO2012013881 (RENAULT SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 30 *; | [A]US6134890 (CHURCH PETER D [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 19 *; | [A]EP1903203 (RENAULT SA [FR]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0025] * |