EP3793662 - A VALVED INTRODUCER SHEATH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National University of Ireland Galway University Road Galway / IE | [2021/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUCHIER-HAYES, Jonathan 118 Milltown Hall Mount St. Anne's, Milltown Dublin, 6 / IE | 02 /
KELLY, Michael Munnia Burrin New Quay Co. Clare H91 YE3W / IE | 03 /
BRUZZI, Mark 7 Devon Gardens Salthill Galway / IE | [2021/12] | Representative(s) | Purdylucey Intellectual Property 6-7 Harcourt Terrace D02 FH73 Dublin 2 / IE | [2021/12] | Application number, filing date | 19728885.5 | 15.05.2019 | [2021/12] | WO2019EP62546 | Priority number, date | EP20180172896 | 17.05.2018 Original published format: EP 18172896 | [2021/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019219784 | Date: | 21.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3793662 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61M39/06 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
A61M39/06 (EP,US);
A61B17/3423 (US);
A61M39/0613 (EP);
A61M2039/0258 (US);
A61M2039/0279 (US);
A61M2039/0282 (US);
A61M2039/0673 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/12] | Title | German: | EINFÜHRHÜLSE MIT VENTIL | [2021/12] | English: | A VALVED INTRODUCER SHEATH | [2021/12] | French: | GAINE D'INTRODUCTION À VALVE | [2021/12] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 11.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 23.08.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 23.08.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.08.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   01.06.2023 | 31.05.2024 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5871474 (HERMANN GEORGE D [US], et al) [A] 1-16; | [A]WO9911308 (DELCATH SYSTEMS INC [US])[A] 1-16; | [A]WO9924097 (STEREOTAXIS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-16; | [A]US2012271116 (KOEHLER CLEVE [US]) [A] 1-16 | by applicant | US5871474 | WO9911308 | WO9924097 | US2012027116 |