EP3810453 - PREDICTIVE REMOTE THERMAL MANAGMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EINRIDE AB Regeringsgatan 65 111 56 Stockholm / SE | [2024/07] |
Former [2021/17] | For all designated states EINRIDE AB Holtermansgatan 1D 411 29 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUTTER, Christoph Rörstrandsgatan 29 113 41 STOCKHOLM / SE | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | [2021/17] | Application number, filing date | 19729555.3 | 13.06.2019 | [2021/17] | WO2019EP65513 | Priority number, date | EP20180178609 | 19.06.2018 Original published format: EP 18178609 | [2021/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019243157 | Date: | 26.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3810453 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3810453 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60L1/02, B60L3/00, B60L58/12, B60L58/26, B60L58/27 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
B60L1/02 (EP);
B60L58/26 (EP,US);
B60L3/0046 (EP,US);
B60L58/12 (EP,US);
B60L58/27 (EP,US);
B60L2200/36 (EP,US);
B60L2240/26 (EP,US);
B60L2240/545 (EP,US);
B60L2240/622 (EP);
B60L2240/642 (EP);
B60L2240/662 (EP);
B60L2240/665 (EP);
B60L2240/667 (EP);
B60L2240/68 (EP,US);
B60L2240/70 (EP,US);
B60L2260/56 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/72 (EP);
Y02T90/16 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PRÄDIKTIVES FERNWÄRMEMANAGEMENT | [2021/17] | English: | PREDICTIVE REMOTE THERMAL MANAGMENT | [2021/17] | French: | GESTION THERMIQUE À DISTANCE PRÉDICTIVE | [2023/18] |
Former [2021/17] | GESTION THERMIQUE PRÉDICTIVE À DISTANCE | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 18.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 18.10.2023 | ES | 18.10.2023 | HR | 18.10.2023 | PL | 18.10.2023 | RO | 18.10.2023 | RS | 18.10.2023 | SK | 18.10.2023 | SM | 18.10.2023 | NO | 18.01.2024 | GR | 19.01.2024 | IS | 18.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RO | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 18.10.2023 | |
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 18.10.2023 | |
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 19.01.2024 | |
IS | 18.02.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2012158229 (SCHAEFER TIM [DE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [XYI]US2013030630 (LUKE HOK-SUM HORACE [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,9,11,12 * abstract * * figures 1-8 * * paragraphs [0003] , [00 9] - [0022] - [0076] - [0107] * * claims 1-35 * [Y] 7 [I] 4,6,8-10; | [A]US2014316630 (KOHLBERGER MARKUS [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US2015100188 (WAGNER ANDREAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2017129359 (DUNLAP BROCK [US], et al) [Y] 7 * abstract * * paragraph [0052] *; | [XI]US2018141552 (MARCICKI JAMES MATTHEW [US]) [X] 1,3,4,8,10-12 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0 14] - [0015] - [0022] , [0037] , [0 42] - [0050] * * claims 1-20 *[I] 2,5,6,9 | Examination | US5545967 | WO2007128876 | US2014180519 | US9056556 | US2015239365 | WO2015177210 | US2016195587 | WO2016202360 | WO2017100613 | US2017210390 | DE102018206256 |