EP3801666 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING A FLUID VOLUME FLOW THROUGH AN IMPLANTED VASCULAR SUPPORT SYSTEM AND VASCULAR SUPPORT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2023 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kardion GmbH Quellenstrasse 7 70376 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUMBACH, Hardy Roter Stich 129 70376 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
KASSEL, Julian Renz-von-Damnitz-Ring 6 75181 Pforzheim / DE | 03 /
SCHELLENBERG, Inga Mönchstrasse 15 70191 Stuttgart / DE | 04 /
BUDDE, Martina Am Kegelsgrund 20 76229 Karlsruhe / DE | 05 /
SCHLEBUSCH, Thomas, Alexander Hirschstrasse 4 71272 Renningen / DE | [2021/18] |
Former [2021/15] | 01 /
BAUMBACH, Hardy Roter Stich 129 70376 Stuttgart / DE | ||
02 /
KASSEL, Julian Renz-von-Damnitz-Ring 6 75181 Pforzheim / DE | |||
03 /
SCHELLENBERG, Inga Auf der Altenburg 19 70376 Stuttgart / DE | |||
04 /
BUDDE, Martina Am Kegelsgrund 20 76229 Karlsruhe / DE | |||
05 /
SCHLEBUSCH, Thomas, Alexander Hirschstrasse 4 71272 Renningen / DE | Representative(s) | Gauss, Nikolai, et al Pfiz/Gauss Patentanwälte PartmbB Tübingerstraße 26 70178 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 19729726.0 | 06.06.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019EP64800 | Priority number, date | DE201810208870 | 06.06.2018 Original published format: DE102018208870 | [2021/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019234161 | Date: | 12.12.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3801666 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/10, A61M1/12 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
A61M60/13 (EP);
A61M60/523 (US);
A61M60/178 (EP,US);
A61M60/216 (EP,US);
A61M60/515 (EP,US);
A61M60/546 (EP,US);
A61M60/816 (EP);
A61M60/857 (US);
A61M2205/3368 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES FLUID-VOLUMENSTROMS DURCH EIN IMPLANTIERTES, VASKULÄRES UNTERSTÜTZUNGSSYSTEM UND VASKULÄRES UNTERSTÜTZUNGSSYSTEM | [2021/15] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING A FLUID VOLUME FLOW THROUGH AN IMPLANTED VASCULAR SUPPORT SYSTEM AND VASCULAR SUPPORT SYSTEM | [2021/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER UN DÉBIT VOLUMIQUE DE FLUIDE TRAVERSANT UN SYSTÈME D'ASSISTANCE VASCULAIRE IMPLANTÉ ET SYSTÈME D'ASSISTANCE VASCULAIRE | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 14.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO2012112378 (VASCOR INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8-12,14-17,20 * abstract * * paragraph [0258] * [A] 3-6,18,21,22; | [XAI]WO2014141284 (MAGENTA MEDICAL LTD [IL]) [X] 1,2,7-11,13,17,19 * abstract * * page 106, line 24 - page 107, line 5 * [A] 3-6,18,21,22 [I] 12; | [A]WO2014165635 (CIRCULITE INC [US]) [A] 1-22 * abstract ** paragraph [0042] * |