EP3814449 - SALT OF MONOCHLOROACETIC ACID WITH CHELATING AGENT FOR DELAYED ACIDIFICATION IN THE OIL FIELD INDUSTRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nouryon Chemicals International B.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [2021/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN LARE, Cornelis Elizabeth Johannus Esdoornstraat 22 6602 GE Wijchen / NL | 02 /
LEON MATHEUS, Maria Antonieta Houtsingel 1 7214 GC Epse / NL | 03 /
SCHUTTE, Jannes Laar-Enk 8 8162 CH Epe / NL | 04 /
KOOIJMAN, Cornelis Zwolseweg 99 7412 AC Deventer / NL | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | LKGlobal UK Ltd. Cambridge House Henry Street Bath BA1 1BT / GB | [2022/33] |
Former [2021/18] | LKGlobal UK Ltd. Cambridge House, Henry Street Bath BA1 1BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 19730365.4 | 17.06.2019 | [2021/18] | WO2019EP65805 | Priority number, date | EP20180179849 | 26.06.2018 Original published format: EP 18179849 | [2021/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020002011 | Date: | 02.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3814449 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3814449 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C09K8/74 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
C09K8/74 (EP,RU,US);
C09K8/76 (US);
C09K2208/10 (US);
C09K2208/32 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SALZ DER MONOCHLORESSIGSÄURE MIT CHELATBILDNER ZUR VERZÖGERTEN ANSÄUERUNG IN DER ÖLFELDINDUSTRIE | [2021/18] | English: | SALT OF MONOCHLOROACETIC ACID WITH CHELATING AGENT FOR DELAYED ACIDIFICATION IN THE OIL FIELD INDUSTRY | [2021/18] | French: | SEL D'ACIDE MONOCHLOROACÉTIQUE AVEC UN AGENT CHÉLATANT POUR UNE ACIDIFICATION RETARDÉE DANS L'INDUSTRIE DES CHAMPS PÉTROLIFÈRES | [2022/08] |
Former [2021/18] | SEL D'ACIDE MONOCHLOROACÉTIQUE AVEC AGENT CHÉLATANT POUR UNE ACIDIFICATION RETARDÉE DANS L'INDUSTRIE DES CHAMPS PÉTROLIFÈRES | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 22.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 17.08.2022 | AT | 17.08.2022 | CZ | 17.08.2022 | EE | 17.08.2022 | ES | 17.08.2022 | FI | 17.08.2022 | HR | 17.08.2022 | LT | 17.08.2022 | LV | 17.08.2022 | MC | 17.08.2022 | NL | 17.08.2022 | PL | 17.08.2022 | RS | 17.08.2022 | SE | 17.08.2022 | SI | 17.08.2022 | SK | 17.08.2022 | SM | 17.08.2022 | GR | 18.11.2022 | IS | 17.12.2022 | PT | 19.12.2022 | [2024/09] |
Former [2023/37] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 17.08.2022 | |
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 17.08.2022 | |
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US4122896 (SCHEUERMAN RONALD F, et al) [AD] 1-17* the whole document *; | [XDI]US2009042748 (FULLER MICHAEL J [US]) [XD] 1,4,7,9,11,12,17 * claims * [I] 1-17; | [XDI]US2014296113 (REYES ENRIQUE ANTONIO [US], et al) [XD] 1,7,9,11,12,17 * claims * [I] 1-17; | [XDI]WO2015030801 (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERV INC [US]) [XD] 1,2,7-9,11-13,17 * claims * * paragraph [0003] * [I] 1-17; | [A]US2015211345 (REYES ENRIQUE A [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0047] * * claims * | by applicant | US3885630 | US4122896 | US2009042748 | US2014296113 | WO2015030801 | GB2519388 | US2016115376 |