EP3802988 - FIRE RATED GLASS FLOORING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ely Holdings Limited 103A High Street Lees Oldham OL4 4LY / GB | For all designated states RBCD Holdings Ltd. Unit 55, 2495 Davies Ave. Port Coquitlam, BC V3C 0B2 / CA | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAE, Michael Scott Unit 4, Cromford Business Park Cromford Street Oldham Greater Manchester OL1 4EA / GB | 02 /
DENNETT, Ryan Bruce Charles Unit 55 2495 Davies Ave. Port Coquitlam British Colombia V3C 0B2 / CA | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 19730452.0 | 30.05.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019GB51484 | Priority number, date | GB20180009091 | 04.06.2018 Original published format: GB 201809091 | [2021/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019234394 | Date: | 12.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3802988 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3802988 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/02, E04F15/08, E04F15/18, E04F17/00, E04B5/46 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
E04F15/08 (EP,GB);
E04B5/46 (EP,GB,US);
E04F15/02016 (EP,US);
E04B5/023 (EP);
E04B5/10 (EP,US);
E04B5/14 (EP);
E04F15/02044 (EP,US);
E04F15/181 (EP,US);
E04F17/00 (EP);
E04F15/107 (US);
E04F2015/02072 (EP,US);
E04F2203/023 (EP);
E04F2203/026 (EP,US);
E04F2290/047 (EP);
E06B3/66 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FEUERFESTER GLASBODEN | [2021/15] | English: | FIRE RATED GLASS FLOORING | [2021/15] | French: | SOL EN VERRE INGNIFUGÉ | [2022/04] |
Former [2021/15] | REVÊTEMENT DE SOL EN VERRE RÉSISTANT AU FEU | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 09.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 20.07.2022 | AT | 20.07.2022 | CZ | 20.07.2022 | DK | 20.07.2022 | EE | 20.07.2022 | ES | 20.07.2022 | FI | 20.07.2022 | HR | 20.07.2022 | IT | 20.07.2022 | LT | 20.07.2022 | LV | 20.07.2022 | MC | 20.07.2022 | NL | 20.07.2022 | PL | 20.07.2022 | RO | 20.07.2022 | RS | 20.07.2022 | SE | 20.07.2022 | SI | 20.07.2022 | SK | 20.07.2022 | SM | 20.07.2022 | NO | 20.10.2022 | GR | 21.10.2022 | IS | 20.11.2022 | PT | 21.11.2022 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 20.07.2022 | |
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 20.07.2022 | |
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 20.07.2022 | |
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | NL | 20.07.2022 | Cited in | International search | [AD]GB2373005 (ROGER WILDE LTD [GB]) [AD] 1-21 * page 10, line 20 - page 11, line 30; figure 3 * * page 1, line 3 - line 11 *; | [A]US9926709 (O'KEEFFE WILLIAM F [US]) [A] 1-21* column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 14; figures 2,3 * | by applicant | GB2373005 |