EP3975980 - WATER-RESISTANT COSMETIC COMPOSITION COMPRISING LIGHT GREEN CLAY AND A PROBIOTIC-DERIVED ACTIVE INGREDIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.03.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
L'OREAL 14 rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | For:AL
Trajano, Patricia Ilha do Fundão 00 - Via Projetada 1 do PAL 48212 N° 2100 Ilha do Bom Jesus Cidade Universitária 21941-972 Rio De Janeiro-RJ / BR | [2023/15] |
Former [2022/14] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | ||
For:AL
Trajano, Patricia Ilha do Fundão 00 - Via Projetada 1 do PAL 48212 N° 2100 Ilha do Bom Jesus Cidade Universitária 21941-972 Rio De Janeiro-RJ / BR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRAJANO, Patricia Ilha do Fundão 00 - Via Projetada 1 do PAL 48212 n° 2100 Ilha do Bom Jesus Cidade Universitária 21941-972 Rio De Janeiro-RJ / BR | 02 /
FERREIRA, Renata Souto Maior Afonso Ilha do Fundão 00 - Via Projetada 1 do PAL 48212 n° 2100 Ilha do Bom Jesus Cidade Universitária 21941-972 Rio De Janeiro-RJ / BR | 03 /
FONOLLA-MORENO, Angeles Ilha do Fundão 00 - Via Projetada 1 do PAL 48212 n° 2100 Ilha do Bom Jesus Cidade Universitária 21941-972 Rio De Janeiro-RJ / BR | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Casalonga Casalonga & Partners Bayerstraße 71/73 80335 München / DE | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 19730663.2 | 31.05.2019 | [2022/14] | WO2019BR50199 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020237329 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3975980 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/26, A61K8/99, A61Q17/04 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
A61K8/99 (EP);
A61K8/26 (EP);
A61Q17/04 (EP);
A61K2800/596 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Title | German: | WASSERBESTÄNDIGE KOSMETISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT HELLGRÜNEM TON UND EINEM AUS PROBIOTIKUM GEWONNENEN WIRKSTOFF | [2022/14] | English: | WATER-RESISTANT COSMETIC COMPOSITION COMPRISING LIGHT GREEN CLAY AND A PROBIOTIC-DERIVED ACTIVE INGREDIENT | [2022/14] | French: | COMPOSITION COSMÉTIQUE RÉSISTANT À L'EAU COMPRENANT DE L'ARGILE VERT CLAIR ET UN INGRÉDIENT ACTIF DÉRIVÉ D'UN PROBIOTIQUE | [2022/14] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 27.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0922740 (SHISEIDO CO LTD [JP]); | [A]WO2009053564 (OREAL [FR], et al); | [A]EP2181703 (OREAL [FR]); | [I]WO2012107550 (CINFA S A LAB [ES], et al); | [A]WO2013067185 (BIOS LLC [US]) | by applicant | US2463264 | EP0043128 | US4464362 | US5166355 | WO9304665 | US5237071 | US5240975 | EP0669323 | GB2303549 | DE19726184 | EP0893119 | DE19855649 | US7470725 |