EP3811572 - PROCESSING LOCAL AREA NETWORK DIAGNOSTIC DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states British Telecommunications public limited company 1 Braham Street London E1 8EE / GB | [2022/07] |
Former [2021/17] | For all designated states British Telecommunications public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCAHILL, Francis Ground Floor, Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | 02 /
RINGLAND, Simon Ground Floor, Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | 03 /
TWELL, Timothy Ground Floor, Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | [2023/13] |
Former [2021/17] | 01 /
SCAHILL, Francis Ground Floor, Faraday Building, 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | ||
02 /
RINGLAND, Simon Ground Floor, Faraday Building, 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | |||
03 /
TWELL, Timothy Ground Floor, Faraday Building, 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | Representative(s) | British Telecommunications public limited company Intellectual Property Department 9th Floor One Braham Braham Street London E1 8EE / GB | [2023/13] |
Former [2021/17] | British Telecommunications public limited company Intellectual Property Department Ground Floor, Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 19731311.7 | 21.06.2019 | [2021/17] | WO2019EP66513 | Priority number, date | EP20180179579 | 25.06.2018 Original published format: EP 18179579 | [2021/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020002159 | Date: | 02.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3811572 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3811572 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L43/02, H04L43/06, H04L43/04, H04L69/04, H04L67/5651, // H04L43/028, H04L12/28 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
H04L43/02 (EP);
H04L43/0817 (US);
H04L43/04 (EP,US);
H04L43/06 (EP,US);
H04L43/10 (US);
H04L67/5651 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/17] | H04L12/26, H04L29/06, H04L29/08, H04L12/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERARBEITUNG DER DIAGNOSEDATEN EINES LOKALEN NETZWERKS | [2021/17] | English: | PROCESSING LOCAL AREA NETWORK DIAGNOSTIC DATA | [2021/17] | French: | TRAITEMENT DES DONNÉES DE DIAGNOSTIC DE RÉSEAU LOCAL | [2022/45] |
Former [2021/17] | TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES DE DIAGNOSTIC DE RÉSEAU LOCAL | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 16.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 14.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.03.2023 | CZ | 29.03.2023 | DK | 29.03.2023 | EE | 29.03.2023 | ES | 29.03.2023 | FI | 29.03.2023 | HR | 29.03.2023 | IT | 29.03.2023 | LT | 29.03.2023 | LV | 29.03.2023 | MC | 29.03.2023 | NL | 29.03.2023 | PL | 29.03.2023 | RO | 29.03.2023 | RS | 29.03.2023 | SE | 29.03.2023 | SI | 29.03.2023 | SK | 29.03.2023 | SM | 29.03.2023 | IE | 21.06.2023 | LU | 21.06.2023 | NO | 29.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | GR | 30.06.2023 | IS | 29.07.2023 | PT | 31.07.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
CZ | 29.03.2023 | ||
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
MC | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SI | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
IE | 21.06.2023 | ||
LU | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
BE | 30.06.2023 | ||
CH | 30.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
CZ | 29.03.2023 | ||
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
MC | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
IE | 21.06.2023 | ||
LU | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
CZ | 29.03.2023 | ||
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
MC | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
LU | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
CZ | 29.03.2023 | ||
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
MC | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 29.03.2023 | |
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 29.03.2023 | |
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 29.03.2023 | |
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 29.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6041351 (KHO SAMUEL P [US]) [Y] 1-15 * column 1, line 5 - column 5, line 60; figures 4A, 4B *; | [Y]US8874741 (HASSAN OMAR [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 2, line 59 - column 8, line 29; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2016123383 (QUANTUM METRIC LLC [US]) [A] 6-10* paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0137]; figures 1-8 * | by applicant | US6041351 | US8874741 | WO2016123383 | - PANKAJ GUPTANICK MCKEOWN, "Algorithms for Packet Classification", IEEE Network: Magazine of Global Internetworking, vol. 15, no. 2, (20010300), pages 24 - 32, URL: http://vuba.stanford.edu/~nickm/papers/classificationtutorial01.pdf, XP011092081 | - JILL R. GOLDSCHNEIDER, Lossy Compression of Scientific Data via Wavelets and Vector Quantization, (20000200), URL: https://diaital.lib.washinaton.edu/researchworks/handle/1773/5881 |