EP3745899 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING AN ARTICLE OF FOOTWEAR WITH A THERMOFORMED SIPED SOLE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKE Innovate C.V. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005 / US | [2020/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CROSS, Tory M. c/o NIKE, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005 / US | 02 /
HURD, John c/o NIKE, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005 / US | 03 /
LEVY, Cassidy R. c/o NIKE, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005 / US | 04 /
NORDSTROM, Matthew D. c/o NIKE, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005 / US | 05 /
ZORMEIR, James c/o NIKE, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005 / US | [2020/50] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2020/50] | Application number, filing date | 19731552.6 | 31.05.2019 | [2020/50] | WO2019US35076 | Priority number, date | US201862678587P | 31.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862678587 P | [2020/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019232492 | Date: | 05.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3745899 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3745899 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A43B13/12, A43B13/14, A43B13/32 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
A43B13/141 (EP,CN,US);
A43B13/04 (CN,US);
B29D35/122 (CN,US);
A43B13/12 (EP,CN);
A43B13/32 (EP,CN);
A43D35/00 (CN,US);
B29D35/0054 (CN,US);
B29D35/067 (US);
B29K2023/083 (CN,US);
B29K2075/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SCHUHARTIKELS MIT THERMOGEFORMTER SOHLENSTRUKTUR MIT EINSCHNITTEN | [2020/50] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING AN ARTICLE OF FOOTWEAR WITH A THERMOFORMED SIPED SOLE STRUCTURE | [2020/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ARTICLE CHAUSSANT PRÉSENTANT UNE STRUCTURE DE SEMELLE LAMELLISÉE THERMOFORMÉE | [2020/50] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/50] | 31.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 08.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP22201485.4 / EP4140348 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 19.10.2022 | AT | 19.10.2022 | CZ | 19.10.2022 | DK | 19.10.2022 | EE | 19.10.2022 | ES | 19.10.2022 | FI | 19.10.2022 | HR | 19.10.2022 | IT | 19.10.2022 | LT | 19.10.2022 | LV | 19.10.2022 | MC | 19.10.2022 | NL | 19.10.2022 | PL | 19.10.2022 | RO | 19.10.2022 | RS | 19.10.2022 | SE | 19.10.2022 | SI | 19.10.2022 | SK | 19.10.2022 | SM | 19.10.2022 | NO | 19.01.2023 | GR | 20.01.2023 | IS | 19.02.2023 | PT | 20.02.2023 | BE | 31.05.2023 | CH | 31.05.2023 | IE | 31.05.2023 | LI | 31.05.2023 | LU | 31.05.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
BE | 31.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
IE | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
LU | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
IE | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
LU | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
LU | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
LU | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 19.10.2022 | |
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 19.10.2022 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2907058 (EVINS DAVID E) [Y] 3,4 * columns 1,3,4; figures 8,9 *; | [XAI]US2010269271 (KIM NAMKOOK [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,11-13 * paragraphs [0006] , [0028]; figures 1,4,5 * [A] 3,4,7-10,14-18 [I] 19-21; | [A]US2014015169 (WAN TEE L [US], et al) [A] 1-21* paragraphs [0005] , [0008] , [0023]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US2015290892 (WAN TEE L [US], et al) [Y] 7-9 * paragraphs [0043] - [0045]; figures 6-10 *; | [XAYI]WO2016144413 (NIKE INNOVATE CV [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,11,13 * paragraphs [0004] , [0121] , [0122]; figures 1,2,7,21,22,40 * [A] 6,10,12,14-18 [Y] 3,4,7-9 [I] 19-21; | [XAI]US2017099907 (CIN DAVID [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6,11-14,16,18 * paragraphs [0053] , [0155] , [0156]; figures 2D, 2J, 3I * [A] 3,4,7-10 [I] 15,17,19-21 | by applicant | US2017311672 | US2018133995 |