EP3803867 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR INTELLIGENT VOICE ACTIVATION FOR AUTO-MIXING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shure Acquisition Holdings, Inc. 5800 West Touhy Avenue Niles, IL 60714 / US | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LESTER, Michael Ryan 2020 Bluffside Terrace Colorado Springs, CO 80919 / US | 02 /
REGALBUTO, Jose Roberto 5704 N. Spaulding Ave., Apt. 2 Chicago, IL 60659 / US | 03 /
CASON, David, Grant 858 North Crestview Drive Palatine, IL 60067 / US | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Schollweck, Susanne ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 19731848.8 | 30.05.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019US34692 | Priority number, date | US201862678863P | 31.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862678863 P | [2021/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019232235 | Date: | 05.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3803867 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3803867 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G10L25/87, H04M3/56, H04R3/00, G10L21/043 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
G10L25/87 (EP);
G10L21/0308 (US);
G10L21/0224 (US);
G10L21/0232 (US);
G10L25/84 (US);
H04R3/005 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR INTELLIGENTEN SPRACHAKTIVIERUNG ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN MISCHEN | [2021/15] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR INTELLIGENT VOICE ACTIVATION FOR AUTO-MIXING | [2021/15] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'ACTIVATION VOCALE INTELLIGENTE POUR AUTO-MIXAGE | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 30.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.01.2024 | BG | 10.01.2024 | ES | 10.01.2024 | HR | 10.01.2024 | LT | 10.01.2024 | LV | 10.01.2024 | NL | 10.01.2024 | PL | 10.01.2024 | SE | 10.01.2024 | NO | 10.04.2024 | RS | 10.04.2024 | GR | 11.04.2024 | IS | 10.05.2024 | PT | 10.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 10.01.2024 | |
BG | 10.01.2024 | ||
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
LV | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
PL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
PT | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 10.01.2024 | |
BG | 10.01.2024 | ||
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 10.01.2024 | |
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 10.01.2024 | |
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 10.01.2024 | |
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 10.01.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5991277 (MAENG JOON [US], et al); | [I]US7412376 (FLORENCIO DINEI [US], et al) |