EP3807485 - CONFIGURATION OF ENTRANCE SYSTEMS HAVING ONE OR MORE MOVABLE DOOR MEMBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASSA ABLOY Entrance Systems AB Box 131 261 22 Landskrona / SE | [2021/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DREYER, Roger Östra Kannikvägen 2 23791 Bjärred / SE | [2023/46] |
Former [2021/16] | 01 /
DREYER, Roger Östra Kannikvägen 2 23791 BJÄRRED / SE | Representative(s) | Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/16] | Ström & Gulliksson AB P O Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 19732282.9 | 12.06.2019 | [2021/16] | WO2019EP65274 | Priority number, date | SE20180030193 | 15.06.2018 Original published format: SE 1830193 | [2021/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019238718 | Date: | 19.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3807485 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/603, E05F15/73, E05F15/74, E05F15/76 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
E05F15/76 (EP);
E05F15/73 (EP,US);
E05F15/603 (EP,US);
E05F15/74 (EP);
E05F2015/767 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/434 (US);
E05Y2400/44 (US);
E05Y2400/456 (EP,US);
E05Y2800/00 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/132 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] | Title | German: | KONFIGURATION VON EINGANGSSYSTEMEN MIT EINEM ODER MEHREREN BEWEGLICHEN TÜRELEMENTEN | [2021/16] | English: | CONFIGURATION OF ENTRANCE SYSTEMS HAVING ONE OR MORE MOVABLE DOOR MEMBERS | [2021/16] | French: | CONFIGURATION DE SYSTÈMES D'ENTRÉE COMPORTANT UN OU PLUSIEURS ÉLÉMENTS DE PORTE MOBILES | [2021/16] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/16] | 25.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US7525412 (JANKOVSKY THOMAS JASON [US]); | [A]US7548557 (HOM WAYNE C [US]); | [XPI]WO2019043084 (ASSA ABLOY ENTRANCE SYSTEMS AB [SE]) |