EP3867408 - ELECTRIC FIELD-ASSISTED JUNCTIONS FOR SEQUENCING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Straße 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [2021/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASTIER, Yann c/o Roche Sequencing Solutions, Inc. 4300 Hacienda Drive Pleasanton, California 94588 / US | 02 /
MAJZIK, Zsolt c/o Roche Sequencing Solutions, Inc. 4300 Hacienda Drive Pleasanton, California 94588 / US | 03 /
MITCHELL, Flint c/o Roche Sequencing Solutions, Inc. 4300 Hacienda Drive Pleasanton, California 94588 / US | 04 /
TOPOLANCIK, Juraj c/o Roche Sequencing Solutions, Inc. 4300 Hacienda Drive Pleasanton, California 94588 / US | [2021/34] | Representative(s) | Hildebrandt, Martin K. E. Roche Diagnostics GmbH Nonnenwald 2 82377 Penzberg / DE | [2021/34] | Application number, filing date | 19732344.7 | 19.06.2019 | [2021/34] | WO2019EP66199 | Priority number, date | US201862748223P | 19.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862748223 P | [2021/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020078595 | Date: | 23.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3867408 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6869 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6869 (EP,US);
G01N27/3272 (US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2521/101, C12Q2535/122, C12Q2563/113, C12Q2563/116, C12Q2565/607 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/34] | Title | German: | DURCH ELEKTRISCHES FELD GESTÜTZTE VERBINDUNGSSTELLEN ZUR SEQUENZIERUNG | [2021/34] | English: | ELECTRIC FIELD-ASSISTED JUNCTIONS FOR SEQUENCING | [2021/34] | French: | JONCTIONS ASSISTÉES PAR CHAMP ÉLECTRIQUE POUR LE SÉQUENÇAGE | [2021/34] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/34] | 19.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2016183218 (ILLUMINA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-18* abstract *; | [Y]WO2017207613 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [Y] 1-18 * abstract * * page 1, line 17 - line 20 * * page 2, line 6 - page 3, line 2 *; | [XYI]WO2018065299 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [X] 1,3-7,9-11 * abstract * * page 1 - page 2 * * page 8, line 5 - line 9 * * page 16, line 8 - line 15 * * page 19, line 17 - line 30 * * page 20, line 6 - line 7 * * page 21, line 25 - line 27 * [Y] 1-18 [I] 8 |