EP3791098 - ELECTRODE STRUCTURES FOR MICRO-VALVES FOR USE IN JETTING ASSEMBLIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Matthews International Corporation Two North Shore Center Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15212 / US | [2021/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUSKIRK, William A. 2910 Park Terrace SW Albany, Oregon 97321 / US | 02 /
FLEGO, Steven E. 13026 SE Ellis Portland, Oregon 97236 / US | 03 /
HALUZAK, Charles C. 5365 Worth Way Philomath, Oregon 97370 / US | 04 /
WHITLOCK, John c/o Matthews International Corporation Two North Shore Center Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15212 / US | 05 /
MILLER, Eric R. 3204 East Yesler Way Seattle, Washington 98122 / US | 06 /
LEIGHTON, Glenn J.T. 41 Lowlands Walk Askern Doncaster South Yorkshire DN6 0NR / GB | 07 /
GILSON, Charles 1731 Pheasant Court Philomath, Oregon 97370 / US | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/11] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 19732458.5 | 09.05.2019 | [2021/11] | WO2019IB53838 | Priority number, date | US201862670286P | 11.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862670286 P | [2021/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019215669 | Date: | 14.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3791098 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/16, B41J2/14, F16K99/00 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
B41J2/14282 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2/14201 (US);
B41J2/1614 (EP,KR);
B41J2/1623 (EP,KR);
B41J2/1626 (KR);
B41J2/1628 (EP);
B41J2/1629 (EP);
B41J2/1631 (EP,KR);
B41J2/1632 (EP);
B41J2/164 (EP,KR);
F16K99/0007 (EP,KR);
F16K99/0048 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2002/14491 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2202/05 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2202/12 (EP);
B41J2202/18 (EP,KR,US);
F16K2099/0092 (EP,KR,US);
H10N30/2042 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/11] | F16K99/00, B41J2/14, H01L41/09 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] | Title | German: | ELEKTRODENSTRUKTUREN FÜR MIKROVENTILE ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI SPÜLANORDNUNGEN | [2021/11] | English: | ELECTRODE STRUCTURES FOR MICRO-VALVES FOR USE IN JETTING ASSEMBLIES | [2021/11] | French: | STRUCTURES À ÉLECTRODES POUR MICRO-VANNES DESTINÉES À ÊTRE UTILISÉES DANS DES ENSEMBLES DE PROJECTION | [2021/11] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 01.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/14] | 28.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8605722 (LANE INT LTD JOHN [GB]); | [YA]US2003030705 (KOIKE SHUJI [JP], et al); | [A]US2006209137 (KOJIMA TOSHIYA [JP], et al); | [XAY]US2014333703 (BUSKIRK WILLIAM A [US], et al); | [A]WO2016030566 (KERAJET S A [ES]) |