EP3814396 - POLYURETHANE FOAM OR POLYETHER POLYOL STABILIZED WITH A BENZOFURANONE-PHOSPHITE DERIVATIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2021/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TARTARINI, Cinzia Via Pila, 6/3 40037 Pontecchio Marconi BO / IT | 02 /
HOELZL, Werner 4, rue de l'Argent 68440 Eschentzwiller / FR | 03 /
KING III, Roswell E. 540 White Plains Road Tarrytown, 10591 / US | 04 /
HERBST, Heinz Hardmattstr. 434 5082 Kaisten / CH | 05 /
ESPINOS ARIZTI, Jorge Can Rabia, 3-5 08017 Barcelona / ES | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE GBI-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2021/18] | Application number, filing date | 19733711.6 | 20.06.2019 | [2021/18] | WO2019EP66377 | Priority number, date | EP20180382482 | 28.06.2018 Original published format: EP 18382482 | [2021/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020002130 | Date: | 02.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3814396 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/48, C08G18/76, C08G18/24 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
C08G18/4829 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/524 (KR);
C08G18/7621 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/244 (EP,KR);
C08J9/0038 (KR);
C08K5/005 (KR,US);
C08K5/105 (KR);
C08K5/134 (US);
C08K5/18 (US);
C08K5/529 (US);
C08G2110/005 (US);
C08G2110/0058 (US);
C08G2110/0066 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] | Title | German: | MIT EINEM BENZOFURANON-PHOSPHIT-DERIVAT STABILISIERTER POLYURETHANSCHAUMSTOFF ODER POLYETHERPOLYOL | [2021/18] | English: | POLYURETHANE FOAM OR POLYETHER POLYOL STABILIZED WITH A BENZOFURANONE-PHOSPHITE DERIVATIVE | [2021/18] | French: | MOUSSE DE POLYURÉTHANE OU POLYOL DE POLYÉTHER STABILISÉ AVEC UN DÉRIVÉ DE BENZOFURANONE-PHOSPHITE | [2021/18] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 28.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/22] | 30.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDA]WO2015121445 (BASF SE [DE]) [XD] 1-5,7-17 * page 63; examples S-7,S-8 * * claim 3 *[A] 6,18 |