EP3809878 - COMPOSITION COMPRISING HUMAN MILK OLIGOSACCHARIDES FOR USE IN IMPROVING, ENHANCING, PROMOTING OR MODULATING A SEROTONERGIC FUNCTION IN THE CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Entre-deux-Villes 1800 Vevey / CH | [2024/18] |
Former [2021/17] | For all designated states Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Entre-deux-Villes 1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAUSER, Jonas 39, Rue de l'Ale 1003 LAUSANNE / CH | 02 /
YAN, Jian 501 Roy Street Unit T305 Seattle, WA 98109 / US | [2023/32] |
Former [2021/17] | 01 /
HAUSER, Jonas 39, Rue de l'Ale 1003 LAUSANNE / CH | ||
02 /
YAN, Jian Av. de Corsier 10 1800 VEVEY / CH | Representative(s) | Krishnan, Sri Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [2021/17] | Application number, filing date | 19733948.4 | 21.05.2019 | [2021/17] | WO2019EP63029 | Priority number, date | US201862689293P | 25.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862689293 P | [2021/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020001862 | Date: | 02.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3809878 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A23L33/10, A23L33/21, A23L33/00, A61K31/702 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
A23L33/21 (EP,US);
A23L33/40 (EP,US);
A23L33/10 (EP,US);
A61K31/702 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT MENSCHLICHEN MILCHOLIGOSACCHARIDEN ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER VERBESSERUNG, VERSTÄRKUNG, FÖRDERUNG ODER MODULATION EINER SEROTONERGEN FUNKTION IM ZENTRALNERVENSYSTEM | [2021/17] | English: | COMPOSITION COMPRISING HUMAN MILK OLIGOSACCHARIDES FOR USE IN IMPROVING, ENHANCING, PROMOTING OR MODULATING A SEROTONERGIC FUNCTION IN THE CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM | [2021/17] | French: | COMPOSITION COMPRENANT DES OLIGOSACCHARIDES DE LAIT HUMAIN DESTINÉE À ÊTRE UTILISÉE DANS L'AMÉLIORATION, LE PERFECTIONNEMENT, LA PROMOTION OU LA MODULATION D'UNE FONCTION SÉROTONINERGIQUE DANS LE SYSTÈME NERVEUX CENTRAL | [2021/17] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 25.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]WO2015086789 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [X] 1-4,7,9,11-13,15,16 * page 25, line 7 - line 12; claims 1-3, 14, 15 * [A] 14 [I] 5,6,8,10; | [A]US2015231213 (CHICHLOWSKI MACIEJ [US], et al) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [XAI]WO2016066735 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [X] 1,4,6,9,11-13 * claim 1 * [A] 14-16 [I] 2,3,5,7,8,10; | [XAI]WO2016146789 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [X] 1,4,7,9,11-13 * page 1, line 6 - line 11; claims 1, 15 * [A] 14-16 [I] 2,3,5,6,8,10; | [XAI]US2018103675 (CHICHLOWSKI MACIEJ [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7-9,11-13 * paragraph [0124]; claims 1, 6, 7 * [A] 14-16 [I] 2,3,6,10 | by applicant | US5288637 | WO9610086 | EP0975235 | - HUANG, E.J.REICHARDT, L. F., "Neurotrophins: Roles in Neuronal Development and Function", Annu. Rev. Neurosci., (20010000), vol. 24, pages 677 - 736 | - MUSUMECI, G.MINICHIELLO, L., "BDNF-TrkB signalling in fear learning: from genetics to neural networks", Rev. Neurosci., (20110000), vol. 22, no. 3, pages 303 - 15 | - XIAO, J. et al., "The role of neurotrophins in the regulation of myelin development", Neurosignals, (20090000), vol. 17, pages 265 - 276 | - VON BOHLENHALBACH, O., "Immunohistological markers for proliferative events, gliogenesis, and neurogenesis within the adult hippocampus", Cell Tissue Res., (20110000), vol. 345, no. 1, pages 1 - 19, XP019923388 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00441-011-1196-4 | - LUBSEN, J. et al., "Microstructural and functional connectivity in the developing preterm brain", Seminars in Perinatology, (20110000), vol. 35, pages 34 - 43 | - TALGE, N. et al., "Late-Preterm Birth and its Association with Cognitive and Socioemotional Outcomes at 6 Years of Age", Pediatrics, (20100000), vol. 126, pages 1124 - 1131 | - VAN BAAR, A. et al., "Functioning at school age of moderately preterm children born at 32 to 36 weeks' gestational age", Pediatrics, (20090000), vol. 124, pages 251 - 257 | - FAROOQI, A et al., "Impact at age 11 years of major neonatal morbidities in children born extremely preterm", Pediatrics, (20110000), vol. 127, pages e1247 - 1257 | - ALLEN, M.C., "Neurodevelopmental outcomes of preterm infants", Curr. Opin Neurol., (20080000), vol. 21, no. 2, pages 123 - 8 | - GREGORY, A. et al., "Intrauterine Growth Restriction Affects the Preterm Infant's Hippocampus", Pediatric Research, (20080000), vol. 63, no. 4, pages 438 - 443 | - BARRETT, R. D. et al., "Destruction and reconstruction: hypoxia and the developing brain", Birth Defects Res. C. Embryo Today, (20070000), vol. 81, pages 163 - 76 | - ROZE et al., "The apparent breastfeeding paradox in very preterm infants: relationship between breast feeding, early weight gain and neurodevelopment based on results from two cohorts, EPIPAGE and LIFT", BMJ Open, (20120000), vol. 2, page e000834 | - HUPPI, P.S., "Nutrition for the Brain", Pediatric Research, (20080000), vol. 63, no. 3, pages 229 - 231 | - CUSIKGEORGIEFF, "The Role of Nutrition in Brain Development: The Golden Opportunity of the ''First 1000 Days", Journal of Pediatrics, (20160000), vol. 175, pages 16 - 21, XP029659252 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpeds.2016.05.013 | - HORTON, R, The Lancet, (20080000), vol. 371, no. 9608, page 179 | - LAUS, M.F. et al., "Early postnatal protein-calorie malnutrition and cognition: a review of human and animal studies", Int. J. Environ. Res. Public Health., (20110000), vol. 8, no. 2, pages 590 - 612 | - MERENS et al., Journal of Affective Disorders, (20070000), vol. 103, pages 43 - 62 | - GIBSON GRROBERFROID MB, "Dietary modulation of the human colonic microbiota: introducing the concept of prebiotics", J Nutr., (19950000), vol. 125, pages 1401 - 12 | - SALMINEN SOUWEHAND A.BENNO Y. et al., "Probiotics: how should they be defined", Trends Food Sci. Technol., (19990000), vol. 10, pages 107 - 10, XP055150446 | - WRODNIGG, T.M.STUTZ, A.E., Angew. Chem. Int. Ed., (19990000), vol. 38, pages 827 - 828 |