EP3823497 - A JOINING AND LEVELLING SYSTEM FOR PARTS OF FURNITURE AND FURNISHING ITEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEONARDO S.r.l. Via Leopardi 8 22060 Figino Serenza (CO) / IT | [2021/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CATTANEO, Carlo Via Leonardo da Vinci 5 22060 Figino Serenza (CO) / IT | [2021/21] | Representative(s) | Dragotti & Associati S.R.L. Via Nino Bixio, 7 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2021/21] | Franco Martegani S.r.l. Via Carlo Alberto, 41 20900 Monza / IT | Application number, filing date | 19734904.6 | 31.05.2019 | [2021/21] | WO2019IB54529 | Priority number, date | IT20180007388 | 20.07.2018 Original published format: IT201800007388 | [2021/21] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020016670 | Date: | 23.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3823497 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3823497 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A47B91/02, F16B12/20 | [2021/21] | CPC: |
F16B12/2063 (EP);
A47B91/022 (US);
A47B91/005 (US);
A47B91/026 (EP);
A47B2230/07 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGS- UND AUSGLEICHSSYSTEM FÜR TEILE VON MÖBELN UND EINRICHTUNGSGEGENSTÄNDEN | [2021/21] | English: | A JOINING AND LEVELLING SYSTEM FOR PARTS OF FURNITURE AND FURNISHING ITEMS | [2021/21] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ASSEMBLAGE ET DE MISE À NIVEAU POUR PARTIES DE MEUBLES ET ARTICLES D'AMEUBLEMENT | [2021/21] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 03.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 15.11.2023 | DK | 15.11.2023 | EE | 15.11.2023 | HR | 15.11.2023 | LT | 15.11.2023 | LV | 15.11.2023 | NL | 15.11.2023 | RO | 15.11.2023 | RS | 15.11.2023 | SE | 15.11.2023 | SK | 15.11.2023 | SM | 15.11.2023 | BG | 15.02.2024 | NO | 15.02.2024 | GR | 16.02.2024 | IS | 15.03.2024 | PT | 15.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RO | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | DK | 15.11.2023 | |
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 15.11.2023 | |
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HR | 15.11.2023 | |
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HR | 15.11.2023 | |
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 15.11.2023 | |
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 16.02.2024 | |
IS | 15.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2017153175 (LEONARDO SRL [IT]) [A] 1-7 * page 8, line 17 - page 27, line 9; figures 12, 13 *; | [A]EP3267050 (LEONARDO SRL [IT]) [A] 1-7* abstract *; | [A]WO2018007237 (LEONARDO SRL [IT]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * |